pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1.

The group owner is required to complete a consolidated annual return on behalf of its members. Consolidated annual return information for these members is available in the Annual Returns tab below.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Adventist Development and Relief Agency
Bethesda Care Limited
Bethesda Village Limited
LHF Limited
New Zealand Conference of the Seventh Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Health Association Limited
New Zealand Pacific Union Conference of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Wholistic Health And Wellbeing Company Limted
North New Zealand Conference of the Seventh-day Adventist Church
Seventh-day Adventist Church Property Trustee (NZ) Limited

Group Details


Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1

Registration details

Registered
30/06/2008
CC42121
June 30

Address for service

Private Bag 94200
Howick
Auckland
2145
LEVEL 1
18 Fencible Drive
Howick
Auckland
2014

Group's other details

09 250 1770
09 533 0581


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: these Annual Returns contain consolidated financial information for all members of this group.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 20/12/2019 $232,721,376 $257,748,428
30/04/2019 26/04/2019 $245,503,216 $244,704,134
31/12/2017 16/10/2018 $235,238,563 $224,655,514
31/12/2016 25/07/2017 $245,376,586 $256,364,309
31/12/2015 31/12/2015 $223,538,562 $214,002,641
31/12/2014 31/12/2014 $204,775,009 $201,792,561
31/12/2013 31/12/2013 $204,557,261 $199,336,237
31/12/2012 31/12/2012 $187,132,559 $187,188,889
31/12/2011 30/12/2011 $89,838,517 $98,723,177
31/12/2010 17/01/2011 $88,197,000 $93,628,000

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To facilitate the the mission of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church within New Zealand

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (includes schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Commercial Activities for raising funds to promote and educate healthy eating and healthy living ...

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, International activities, Fund-raising, Aged Care/Retirement Village and Health Food Production

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Religious groups, Children / young people

Entity Structure

For the purposes of the consolidated group the New Zealand Pacific Union is the parent entity of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church in New Zealand

Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/12/2011 AR004
17/01/2011 AR003
18/12/2009 AR002

Group Documents


Notices

To meet the requirements of the Financial Reporting Act 2013, members of Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 2 group (New Zealand Pacific Union Conference of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church, The New Zealand Seventh-day Adventist Schools Association Limited, Seventh-day Adventist Church Property Trustee (NZ) Limited, South New Zealand Conference of the Seventh-day Adventist Church and North New Zealand Conference of the Seventh-day Adventist Church) have been consolidated into Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1 group on 12 December 2016, and the Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 2 group has been deregistered. Annual return information for these group members for the financial years from 2008 to 2015 will be available on the Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 2 group.