pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Fantail Ministries
Fantail Studios
CC57858
9429048425445
Registered

Registration details

9/07/2020
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 828
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8140
346 Manchester Street
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8013

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Through media our mission is to advance religion by increadin knowledge and understanding of christian beliefs.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Religious activities

Religious groups

Other charities, General public

Entity Structure

Charitiable Trust governed by Trustees

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 30/07/2021 $141,073 $93,250

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Andre Joseph Powell Trustee 21/04/2021
Jared Cameron Van Berkel Trustee 3/07/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andre Luke McBride Linton Trustee 31/03/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/06/2022 NOC007
21/04/2022 NOC004
17/11/2021 NOC003
23/04/2021 NOC001

Charity Documents