Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ngati Poneke Maori Association Incorporated
CC44913
9429042785040
Registered

Registration details

15/08/2010
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
The Ngati Poneke Maori Association Incorporated 16/08/2010
Ngati Poneke Maori Association Incorporated 24/09/2017

Address for service

PO Box 10647
Pipitea
Wellington
6140
55-59 Thorndon Quay
Pipitea
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04-2377732


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

Marae

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Activities: Provides religious services / activities Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides buildings / facilities / open space Sectors: Arts / culture / heritage Education / training / research, Health, Emergency / disaster relief, Religious activities, Sport / recreation, International activities, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering, Marae not on reservation land Beneficiaries: Family / whanau Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Religious groups

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Health, Emergency / disaster relief, Religious activities, Sport / recreation, International activities, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering, Marae not on reservation land

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Religious groups

Legal Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2010 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2011.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 30/09/2024 $98,244 $77,271 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 28/09/2023 $80,917 $68,534 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 29/09/2022 $38,793 $46,543 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 29/09/2021 $22,237 $14,045 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 29/09/2020 $16,524 $9,189 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 29/09/2019 $18,869 $10,408 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 28/09/2018 $41,013 $27,060 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 29/09/2017 $8,621 $2,835 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 5/06/2017 $15,892 $6,115 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Hemi George Smiler Vice President 13/07/2024
Keita Priscilla Tau Secretary 13/07/2024
Lorraine Paranihia Nikera Vice Patron 13/07/2024
Raymond Paul Peeti Delegate, Ngati Poneke Maori Arts 13/07/2024
Tyshah Wheturangi Tiramanuhiri Holmes President 13/07/2024
Waima-Narie Hineira Rehia Mihaka Treasurer 13/07/2024
Krystle Ngarauru Janine Makowharemahihi Committee Member 28/09/2023
Shareen Margaret Andrews NPYMCI President 23/07/2023
Gabrielle Mary Rikihana Patron 16/06/2019
Miriama Teina May Patron 16/06/2019
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Eugene Shane Te Awamate Ryder NPYMCI Proxy 13/07/2024
Hariesa Sarona Lorna Kanavatoa Vice President 13/07/2024
Joanne Gale Chell Committee Member 13/07/2024
Meri Summer Breeze Holmes Secretary 13/07/2024
Wikitoria Morehu Committee Member 13/07/2024
Lorraine Nikera Vice President 23/07/2023
Mere Hammond Patron 23/07/2023
Iwaiwa Holmes Delegate, Ngati Poneke Maori Arts 22/07/2023
Leon Shields Committee Member 26/06/2022
Natalie Smith Secretary 26/06/2022
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/09/2024 NOC013
24/09/2017 NOC005
20/12/2013 NOC003
30/09/2012 AR003
4/10/2011 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.