pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Muaupoko Tribal Authority Incorporated
CC53006
9429042934622
Registered

Registration details

20/08/2015
March 31

Address for service

233 Broadway Avenue
Palmerston North
4414
306 Oxford Street
Levin 5510
Levin
5510

Charity's other details

06 367 3311
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/MuaupokoTribalAuthority


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Muaūpoko Tribal Authority (MTA) was established in 1997 originally as an Incorporated Society. Its main purpose is to protect Muaūpoko identity, assets and to build a stronger economic, social and cultural base for the Muaūpoko people. As a result MTA supports Muaūpoko Whanau, hapu and Iwi to achieve their aspirations in all spheres of whanau life. MTA has been the mandated by Iwi members under the Maori Fisheries Act - as the recognised representative organisation for Muaūpoko for Fisheries and Aquaculture.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Mandated Iwi Authority - provides and supports services to Muaupoko whanau members and represents Muaupoko in manawhenua role.)

Other (please state)

(Mandated Iwi OrganisationIwi Socials and Education Services Provider)

Other (please state)

(Registered Muaupoko Members and nga Uri o Ngai Tara ki Muaupoko o te Ika. )

Entity Structure

MTA is governed by a Board of Trustees which is made up from representatives from each of the 7 Muaupoko Hapu. Each Hapu is able to elect a 3 year, 18 month and alternate Hapu rep for the Board. The MTA Management and Operational team structure consists of a CEO, Whanau Ora Navigators, Youth Mentors, Project staff and administration staff. MTA has a subsidiary charitable company for managing the Iwi's Fisheries quota and assets.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Muaupoko Trading Company Limited CC46663

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
10/10/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
28/09/2022 9/10/2022 $2,847,269 $1,957,922
9/08/2021 10/08/2022 $1,542,598 $1,208,533
30/06/2020 4/08/2020 $1,410,714 $948,148
31/10/2018 28/11/2018 $804,506 $653,255
30/09/2017 1/08/2018 $597,250 $614,542
30/09/2016 8/07/2017 $505,652 $578,814

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Piri Hira Robinson Board Member 26/09/2022
Simon Kuiti Board Member 26/09/2022
Jonathon Procter Board Member 7/06/2016
Tracey White Board Member - Secretary 7/06/2016
Dianne Rump CEO 21/01/2015
Marokopa Wiremu-Matakatea Board Member 1/02/2011
Sillena McGregor Board Member 1/02/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Nina Ann Hori Te Pa Chairperson 31/07/2022
Frances Matehaere Board Member 15/04/2021
Keri Hori Te Pa Board Member 15/04/2021
Rihari Matthews Board Member 15/04/2021
Matt Sword Board Member 28/01/2021
Pirihira Robinson Board Member 28/01/2021
Robert Warrington Deputy Chairperson 28/01/2021
Tim Tukapua Board Member 28/01/2021
Kathy Putaka Board Member 31/03/2018
Pristine Maree Burke Alternate Board Member 7/07/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/11/2022 NOC013
31/05/2021 NOC010
4/07/2017 NOC004
18/07/2016 NOC003
17/05/2016 NOC002
13/05/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents