Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Zeal Youth Trust Aotearoa
Zeal
CC29343
9429043168620
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Zeal Education Trust 30/06/2008
Zeal Youth Trust Aotearoa 24/04/2024

Address for service

ZEAL NATIONAL OFFICE PO Box 121429
Henderson
Auckland
650

Charity's other details

0800 34639325


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To make transformative spaces and experiences accessible to all young people in Aotearoa.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Social services

Education / training / research, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Zeal Youth Enterprises Limited (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 19/10/2023 $3,928,738 $4,179,904 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 11/10/2022 $3,594,176 $3,889,836 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 12/10/2021 $2,887,090 $3,067,548 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 4/12/2020 $3,125,972 $3,299,851 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 13/01/2020 $3,266,307 $3,551,328 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 6/11/2018 $4,029,850 $2,980,930 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 6/12/2017 $2,882,184 $3,050,455 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 12/12/2016 $2,433,287 $2,534,929 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 30/11/2015 $1,504,427 $1,454,630 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 2/11/2014 $2,083,196 $1,029,791 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Andre Afamasaga Trustee 26/03/2024
Karen Beverley Came Trustee 26/03/2024
Charles Looker Trustee 26/04/2023
David Christoffersen Trustee 20/10/2021
Glynis Sandland Trustee 1/09/2020
Jon Chapman-Smith Trustee 2/07/2020
Sandra Stephens Secretary 24/06/2019
Amanda Pilbrow Chairperson 9/10/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gregory Eden Treasurer/Trustee 6/12/2023
Helen Van Orton Trustee 19/09/2023
Murray Thatcher Trustee 6/12/2022
Bruce Pilbrow Chairman 19/10/2020
Sarah van't Hof Trustee 30/04/2020
Jennifer Evette Jody MacKay Secretary 24/06/2019
Matthew Selwyn Grey Trustee 29/06/2018
Brook James Turner Trustee 4/12/2017
Erica Lossie Secretary 1/07/2017
Jeremy Charles Neeve Trustee 1/06/2017
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/05/2024 NOC048
27/05/2024 NOC047
24/04/2024 NOC045
5/04/2024 NOC044
26/09/2023 NOC042
1/05/2023 NOC041
21/02/2023 NOC040
27/10/2021 NOC038
9/11/2020 NOC035
23/10/2020 NOC034
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.