pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Family First New Zealand
Family First
CC10094
9429043037872
Deregistered
18/09/2017
The Charities Registration Board determined that Family First no longer qualifies for registration as a charity because it does not advance exclusively charitable purposes as required by section 13(1) of the Act. The Board decided to remove Family First from the Register, pursuant to section 31 of the Act. The Board’s decision was appealed. On 28 June 2022, the Supreme Court held that the Board’s decision resolving that Family First be deregistered with effect from 18 September 2017 was correct.

Below are details of Family First New Zealand at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

20/03/2007
March 31
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 18/09/2017 The Charities Registration Board determined that Family First no longer qualifies for registration as a charity because it does not advance exclusively charitable purposes as required by section 13(1) of the Act. The Board decided to remove Family First from the Register, pursuant to section 31 of the Act. The Board’s decision was appealed. On 28 June 2022, the Supreme Court held that the Board’s decision resolving that Family First be deregistered with effect from 18 September 2017 was correct.
Registered 20/03/2007

Address for service

PO Box 276133
Manukau City
Auckland
2241
Parkview Tower Level 4
28 Davies Ave
Manukau
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details

(09)2612426
(09)2612520


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote a just and equitable society through the research and education provided on marriage relationships, family issues and the protection of the values of all people from a responsible, culturally sensitive perspective. New Zealanders need a voice that can research and advocate for strong families and communities, which is why Family First exists.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research

Education / training / research

Community development, Social services, Promotion of volunteering, Family/Whanau

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Other charities, General public

Entity Structure

Trust administered by a board of trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 1/09/2021 $1,389,607 $1,330,938
30/09/2020 14/09/2020 $1,057,499 $893,144
30/09/2019 26/09/2019 $736,778 $578,392
30/09/2018 20/09/2018 $616,067 $533,099
30/09/2017 26/09/2017 $434,918 $377,965
30/09/2016 18/09/2016 $341,947 $386,740
30/09/2015 9/09/2015 $455,330 $475,792
30/09/2014 3/09/2014 $488,695 $459,406
30/09/2013 20/08/2013 $397,534 $374,723

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Eroni Clarke Trustee 18/05/2020
Ate Moala Trustee 6/05/2019
Bruce Logan Trustee 14/10/2014
Sue Reid Trustee 14/10/2014
Nick Tuitasi Trustee 27/05/2013
Ross Mcgregor Wilcox Trustee 31/07/2009
David Sharp Trustee 14/02/2007
Robert McCoskrie Trustee 14/02/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mark Hunter Trustee 8/07/2019
Warren Rodgers Trustee 11/04/2016
David Sutherland Trustee 31/03/2014
Robyn Sewter Trustee 9/04/2008
Stephen Tetley-Jones Trustee 13/02/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/08/2020 NOC022
10/09/2019 NOC019
10/09/2019 NOC018
10/09/2019 NOC017
19/09/2017 NOC014
18/09/2017 NOC013
18/09/2017 NOC012
5/09/2016 NOC010
3/09/2014 NOC009
8/04/2014 NOC008

Charity Documents