Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Golden Bay Work Centre Trust
CC20127
9429042629757
Registered

Registration details

27/11/2007
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 156
Takaka
7142
84 Commercial Street
Takaka 7110
Takaka
7110

Charity's other details

(03) 525 8099
https://www.facebook.com/Golden-Bay-Workcentre-Trust-531366000706268


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The vision statement of the Trust reads “The Workcentre Trust enables individuals and groups to achieve self-determination, create healthy and tolerant lifestyles, and exercise positive choices. It does this by providing facilities, resources, training and learning, opportunities, community services and support.” We provide many different avenues of services and support to achieve this vision statement. This includes education programs for youth and support for people entering in the workforce. We also have an additional areas of focus under this is the element of community development work within the community of Golden Bay, which we have done over the last 30 years.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Community based education and training

Education / training / research

Environment / conservation, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

General public, All without discrimination

Entity Structure

"Trustees are appointed by way of nomination onto the Trust, and remain on the Trust Board for three years. The number of Trustees on the Trust Board is between 5 and 7. This includes the General Manager as a Board Member ex officio. The Trust employees a full time manager to oversee the operations and report back to the Trustees. "

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 1/07/2023 $734,327 $697,836 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 28/06/2022 $688,497 $604,329 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 31/07/2021 $367,905 $356,638 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 5/06/2020 $331,203 $351,402 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 10/04/2019 $276,481 $315,586 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 25/05/2018 $301,298 $295,074 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 23/05/2017 $313,726 $332,392 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 27/06/2016 $300,032 $316,567 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 16/06/2015 $371,156 $343,303 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mark Cullen Trustee 3/08/2021
Cait Tomlinson Ex-officio Trustee and General Manager 1/04/2020
Robert Hewison Trustee and Financial Manager 12/02/2016
Lisa Lewis Trustee 1/12/2015
Hess Williams Trustee 29/11/2015
Sabine Wick Trustee 20/11/2008
Alli Gardener Trustee and Community Development Worker 1/09/1989

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Roger File Trustee 31/12/2019
Daniel Bulman Trustee 3/06/2016
Paul Geoffrey Bastin - 11/03/2016
Belinda Barnes Trustee 27/11/2015
Graeme Hampshire - 27/11/2015
Ian Elsey - 27/11/2015
Linda Sanders Trustee 27/11/2015
Laurelee Ann Duff Trustee 4/09/2015
Sarah Lindsay Hornibrooke Trustee 31/05/2014
Geoff Rennison Trustee/Chair Person 28/04/2014
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/08/2021 NOC018
8/06/2016 NOC012
8/06/2016 NOC011
4/03/2016 NOC010
14/12/2015 NOC009
8/12/2015 NOC008
18/08/2015 NOC007
18/05/2015 NOC006
5/12/2012 NOC001
12/06/2012 AR005
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.