pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Sustainable Queenstown Charitable Trust
CC55448
9429046762405
Registered

Registration details

28/05/2018
June 30

Address for service

Todd and Walker Law
Level 2 Craigs Investment Partners House
5 Mile Centre, 36 Grant Road
Queenstown
9371

Charity's other details

0211661863


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Sustainable Queenstown provides proactive responses to environmental challenges within Queenstown Lakes. Sustainable Queenstown makes a meaningful difference on the ground and enables our community to do the same. We think globally - through our alignment to selected UN SDG’s,which focus on Climate and Waste. We act locally - through our events, our green drinks, and partnerships and collaborations.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Environment / conservation

General public

Entity Structure

Board of Trustees- minimum of 5 for a quorum, and maximum of 9, all volunteers. We have a paid Executive Officer.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 12/12/2022 $27,186 $28,531
31/12/2021 1/03/2022 $33,357 $40,883
31/12/2020 15/12/2020 $38,256 $35,253
31/12/2019 17/12/2019 $50,116 $14,554

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Portia Thompson Trustee 15/08/2022
Greg Nelson Trustee 8/08/2022
Lucy Deuble Trustee 1/12/2021
Lana Cruickshank Trustee 1/06/2020
James Cummins Trustee 21/05/2020
Tara Strahan Trustee 1/05/2020
Peter Harris Trustee 12/12/2018
Russell King Trustee 9/04/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ella Zhang Trustee 28/07/2022
Selina Pearl Turner Treasurer 11/04/2022
Eleanor Trueman Trustee 1/12/2021
Ting Zhang Trustee 1/03/2021
Hilary Lennox Trustee 1/08/2020
Diana Hubbard Trustee 9/01/2020
Esther Whitehead Trustee 31/08/2019
Louise Vicente Trustee 14/08/2019
Michael Sly Trustee 2/01/2019
Katherine Martin Trustee 12/12/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/03/2022 NOC009
3/05/2020 NOC006
24/11/2019 NOC004
8/09/2019 NOC003
23/08/2018 NOC001

Charity Documents