pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


He Waka Eke Noa Charitable Trust
Ugly Shakespeare Company, Kete Aronui
CC26108
9429043013500
Registered

Registration details

17/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

80 Onehunga Mall
Onehunga
Auckland
1061

Charity's other details

021655633
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/Ugly-Shakespeare-Company-192810717434663/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To facilitate arts access and to inspire arts practitioners and audiences, irrespective of social, economic or geographic isolation.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides access to arts opportunities. Mentors emerging artists)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Economic development, People with disabilities, Youth

Children / young people

General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2022 9/05/2022 $373,425 $375,692
30/06/2021 30/06/2021 $237,475 $209,668
30/06/2020 1/07/2020 $331,340 $286,357
30/06/2019 30/06/2019 $144,143 $215,324
30/06/2018 28/06/2018 $249,121 $191,717
30/06/2017 2/07/2017 $129,864 $164,286
30/06/2016 30/06/2016 $140,422 $157,913
30/06/2015 29/06/2015 $149,154 $149,706
30/06/2014 30/06/2014 $186,778 $163,953

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Gael Haining Ede Secretary 2/07/2019
Emmett Skilton Trustee 1/01/2019
Lara Macgregor Trustee 23/06/2018
David Clendon Chairperson 12/11/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gabriela Timko Treasurer 17/12/2022
Gael Ede Secretary 2/07/2019
John Wadsworth Chair 31/12/2018
Maurice Harvey Trustee 31/05/2018
Emma Bishop Secretary 31/12/2017
Geoffery Peter Emson Chairperson 31/12/2013
Helen Marie Emson Committee Member 31/12/2013
Joanne Hill Trustee 31/12/2013
Jacqueline Smart Secretary 30/01/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/12/2022 NOC027
15/12/2022 NOC026
22/08/2022 NOC024
22/08/2022 NOC023
11/04/2022 NOC021
29/09/2021 NOC020
1/07/2019 NOC017
29/06/2019 NOC015
6/02/2019 NOC014
5/07/2017 NOC012

Charity Documents