Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Thames Coast Kiwi Care Incorporated
CC40090
9429043158836
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 396
Thames
3540
208 Sealey Street
Thames 3500
Te Puru
Thames
3500

Charity's other details

0275779246
https://www.facebook.com/Thames-Coast-Kiwi-Care-451941634970366


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

A:"To protect and enhance the kiwi bird population on the Thames Coast" B:"Do anything necessary or helpful to the above." By the removal of mustelids and other threats, and through education of the local communities, to enhance the conditions for kiwi already resident there to the point where they represent a viable, self-sustaining and growing population.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Protection of Kiwi), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Care / protection of animals

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Other (please state)

(All), Children / young people, Animals, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Members elect a committee, which includes Chair, Treasurer and Secretary. It employs one part time trapping coordinator. There are up to nine committee members and some 75 volunteers. There are two sub-committees; technical group, and the Publicity & Promotion group. The committee usually meets monthly and the sub-committees meet in between the main committee meetings.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 21/09/2023 $115,811 $129,842 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 29/09/2022 $101,816 $96,053 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 25/08/2021 $66,573 $72,104 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 28/09/2020 $88,898 $76,002 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 13/12/2019 $73,949 $42,340 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 8/10/2018 $63,434 $54,515 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 19/02/2018 $41,613 $44,866 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 29/12/2016 $36,318 $23,900 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 4/03/2016 $22,293 $22,142 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 2/12/2014 $29,431 $18,223 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
April Heather Chang Committee Member 21/02/2022
Kevin James Robinson Committee Member 21/06/2019
George Bruce Duncan Wilson Treasurer 1/02/2019
Moira Grace Coatsworth Chair 30/06/2018
Richard Balfour Committee Member 23/02/2018
Sally Avril Poulgrain Secretary 5/11/2016
Charles Finlay Buchanan Committee Member 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
James Glenn Committee member 3/09/2023
Joanne Kaye Richards Committee Member 26/04/2022
Neil John committee member 14/11/2021
Clive Monds Treasurer 24/11/2018
John Longden Committee member 8/11/2018
Inge Bolt Chairperson 30/06/2018
Beverley May Walker Committee Member 5/11/2016
Richard Moyle Committee member 5/11/2016
Shelley Anne Carr Secretary 5/11/2016
Diane Marie Burton Committee Member 14/11/2015
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/09/2022 NOC028
31/05/2022 NOC027
13/05/2021 NOC025
13/05/2021 NOC024
30/01/2020 NOC022
29/01/2020 NOC021
10/10/2019 NOC019
10/10/2019 NOC018
9/10/2019 NOC017
12/12/2018 NOC016
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.