pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Dunedin Community House Incorporated
Dunedin Community House
CC27888
9429042953982
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
August 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
The Dunedin Community House Trust Incorporated 30/06/2008
The Dunedin Community House Incorporated 26/11/2012

Address for service

283 Moray Place
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016
301 Moray Place
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

03 471 6150


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide low-cost accessible rental accommodation for groups providing social services for the people of Dunedin and the wider Otago region. To manage such premises for such purposes on behalf of its tenants and the community of Dunedin. To act always with due respect to "Te Tiriti o Waitangi. To respect the cultural integrity of all groups in Dunedin and the wider Otago region.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Social services

Other charities

Voluntary bodies other than charities

Entity Structure

Members of Dunedin Community House are organisations which provide social services in the Otago region and who have signed leases to rent one or more offices in Dunedin Community House. Dunedin Community House is run by a Management Committee led by a Chairperson. Each member of Dunedin Community House is entitled to nominate one for their members to the management committee. Management of the Dunedin Community House is undertaken via contract with the charitable trust Weave Together. Administr

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 28 February 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 28 February 2010.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
28/02/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
28/02/2021 23/02/2021 $369,010 $326,786
29/02/2020 16/12/2019 $341,487 $340,803
28/02/2019 27/03/2019 $327,055 $311,894
28/02/2018 19/12/2017 $339,377 $296,071
28/02/2017 4/12/2016 $349,572 $314,842
29/02/2016 18/04/2016 $356,367 $298,071
28/02/2015 6/01/2015 $323,861 $317,023
28/02/2014 21/01/2014 $316,000 $312,000
28/02/2013 31/01/2013 $311,522 $307,503

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Joanne Torrance Governance Board Member 18/06/2021
Judith Margaret Hyslop Governance Board Member 18/06/2021
Glenys Forsyth Governance Board Member 20/04/2021
Matthew Paul Gregory Treasurer 15/12/2020
Lesley Zena Paris Governance Board Member 30/11/2020
Andrew Peter Whiley Interim Chairperson 16/06/2020
Ian James McKie Governance Board Member 17/09/2019
Stanley James Hebden Governance Board Member 17/09/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Debbie Roe Chairperson 18/06/2021
Elizabeth Harburg Governance Board Member 18/06/2021
Paul William Stevenson Governance Board Member 18/06/2021
Andrew Henderson Deputy Chairperson 30/11/2020
Heather Wilson Committee member 30/11/2020
Cathy Matthews committee member 20/10/2020
Lesley Paris committee member 2/03/2020
Judith Hyslop Committee member 27/11/2019
David Horne committee member 20/08/2019
Julie Butler Deputy Chairperson 31/03/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/07/2021 NOC025
27/04/2021 NOC024
22/12/2020 NOC022
10/12/2020 NOC021
15/09/2020 NOC020
20/08/2020 NOC019
13/08/2020 NOC018
16/06/2020 NOC017
29/01/2020 NOC016
21/01/2020 NOC015

Charity Documents