pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Linkage Limited
CC41162
9429033473857
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Women's Wellness Limited 30/06/2008
Linkage Limited 23/07/2012

Address for service

PO Box 307
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
293 Grey Street
Hamilton East
Hamilton
3216

Charity's other details

07 857 1200
07 857 1296


Group Members


Below are all the members of Wise Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Blueprint NZ Limited
Blueprint Trust Board
Ecopeople Limited
Linkage Limited
LinkPeople Limited
Mental Health Solutions Limited
Pacific Inc. Limited
Pathways Health Limited
Pathways Trust Board
Wise Trust Board

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2020 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2019 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2014 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2013 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2012 Member of 'Wise Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Bernadette Doube Director 1/07/2012
Paul Bennett Director 1/07/2012
Jacqueline Mary Graham Director 2/05/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Paul Lyon Ingle Director 7/08/2015
Alan Grainer Director 26/05/2015
Angela Wynne Director 26/05/2015
Julie Joy Nelson Director 14/03/2014
Michael David Ward Director 13/08/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/06/2021 NOC009
10/08/2015 NOC008
4/06/2015 NOC007
2/05/2014 NOC006
19/12/2013 NOC005
6/11/2012 NOC004
19/08/2009 NOC003
19/08/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents