Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Betty Loughhead Soroptimist Scholarship Trust
CC37295
N/A
Registered

Registration details

6/30/2008
December 31

Address for service

40 Kauri Street
Miramar
Wellington
6022

Charity's other details

07 377 3495
https://www.facebook.com/Betty-Loughhead-Soroptimist-Scholarship-663272937207868/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Betty Loughhead Soroptimist Scholarship provides financial support to women over the age of 25 who are studying to either: * obtain a qualification to enter (or re-enter) the workforce; or * to gain a further qualification to advance a careers in business, the professions, the arts; or * to change occupation. The Scholarship is intended to provide financial support for study, not fully fund it. Applicants must be enrolled in an NZQA-approved study programme. All study must be undertaken in New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Make grants to women

Education / training / research

Other (please state)

(Women engaged in study or training)

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
12/31/2023 6/30/2024 4/28/2024 $15,086 $15,141 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
12/31/2022 6/30/2023 6/16/2023 $9,468 $10,520 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
12/31/2021 6/30/2022 8/31/2022 $6,272 $5,323 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
12/31/2020 6/30/2021 11/3/2021 $12,924 $8,682 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
12/31/2019 6/30/2020 12/30/2020 $13,340 $9,789 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
12/31/2018 8/31/2019 10/23/2019 $13,253 $9,089 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
12/31/2017 7/31/2018 8/6/2018 $13,719 $9,079 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
12/31/2016 6/30/2017 7/13/2017 $14,871 $10,608 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
12/31/2015 6/30/2016 5/31/2016 $18,328 $10,404 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
12/31/2014 6/30/2015 7/30/2015 $55,865 $10,857 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alexandra (Sandy) Stephens Trustee 5/1/2023
Dianne Macaskill Trustee 1/1/2023
Paula Siddell Trustee 1/1/2023
Maria Turner Trustee 8/31/2022
Avril Davies Trustee 1/1/2022
Jeanette McIntyre Trustee 1/1/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Raylene Northcott Trustee 4/28/2024
Janine Colpman-King Trustee 12/31/2022
Jocelyn Butcher Trustee 12/31/2022
Johanna Cogle Trustee 7/19/2022
Gabrielle Northcott Trustee 12/31/2021
Susan Clutterbuck Trustee 12/31/2021
Jocelyn Butcher Trustee 12/31/2020
Raelene McMullan Trustee 12/31/2020
Colleen Paisley Trustee 12/30/2020
Helen Bywater Trustee 12/30/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/28/2024 NOC020
6/9/2023 NOC018
11/1/2022 NOC017
9/5/2022 NOC016
12/30/2020 NOC012
6/9/2016 NOC008
6/9/2016 NOC007
5/27/2013 AR006
9/14/2010 AR003
7/15/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.