Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


One Double Five Whare Awhina Community House Trust
155 Community House and Taitokerau Community Law
CC50718
N/A
Registered

Registration details

24/06/2014
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 8134
Kensington
Whangarei
0145
155 Kamo Road
Kensington
Whangarei
0112

Charity's other details

09 4370185
https://www.facebook.com/155WhareAwhina


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Vision: A just society: Equity in every aspect of a person's life . Mission: We challenge injustice, inspire change and lead innovation in everything we do. Values: Tika, Pono, Aroha.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Community development

Social services, Community law office

Family / whanau

Children / young people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public

Entity Structure

One Double Five Whare Awhina Community House is governed by not less than 4 trustees. A CEO is employed by and reports to the trust. Employees and volunteers are organised by the CEO.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/03/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2022 31/05/2023 29/11/2023 $4,001,769 $2,157,429 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 2/02/2022 $2,605,927 $2,372,216 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 22/12/2020 $1,462,714 $1,220,121 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 8/01/2020 $993,691 $890,081 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 7/01/2019 $803,405 $671,318 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 13/12/2017 $557,569 $502,027 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 13/12/2016 $682,780 $467,457 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 20/01/2016 $533,038 $532,077 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ashlee Waiaria Ann Peacock Trustee 15/06/2023
Daniel Gotz Trustee 22/02/2022
Noel Christopher Roderick Perry Trustee 12/10/2021
Darren Collins Trustee 14/07/2020
Suman Rattan Trustee 9/10/2018
Elizabeth Cassidy-Nelson Trustee 23/06/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
David Nicholas Trustee 19/12/2023
Frederick Tito Trustee 19/12/2023
Mary Nicholas Trustee 19/12/2023
Freddy De Alwis Trustee 21/02/2023
Daniel Gotz Trustee 5/05/2022
Paul Bathurst Trustee 26/04/2022
Sally Louise Woods Trustee 7/12/2021
Shirleyanne Brown Trustee 26/11/2021
Aroha Shelford Trustee 22/07/2021
Robert Harte Trustee 8/12/2020
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/02/2024 NOC022
12/01/2024 NOC021
30/11/2023 NOC020
5/05/2022 NOC018
1/05/2022 NOC017
25/04/2022 NOC016
25/04/2022 NOC015
20/12/2021 NOC013
17/09/2021 NOC012
30/08/2021 NOC011
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.