Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Special Olympics Hutt Valley Trust
CC42294
9429051424169
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Special Olympics Hutt Valley 30/06/2008
Special Olympics Hutt Valley Trust 13/06/2023

Address for service

28 Beaumont Avenue
Alicetown
Lower Hutt
5010

Charity's other details

04 5600360


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

We provide quality year-round training and competition in a variety of sports for all children and adults with an intellectual disability, giving those athletes opportunities to develop physical fitness, demonstrate courage and participate in sharing life skills and friendships with their families, other athletes and the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Run sports training and competitions for people with intellectual disabilities), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

People with disabilities

Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering, Sports activities for people with intellectual disabilities

Other (please state)

(People with intellectual disabilities), Children / young people, People with disabilities, General public

Entity Structure

Special Olympics Hutt Valley Trust is an incorporated society and also a registered charity. Special Olympics Hutt Valley Trust is governed by a Board of Trustees and a Chairperson. Please refer to Special Olympics Hutt Valley Trust for a list of the current Trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 7/08/2023 7/08/2023 $93,091 $83,181 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 14/06/2022 $65,907 $72,741 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 25/05/2021 $27,406 $18,895 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 4/06/2020 $21,096 $19,507 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 29/05/2019 $25,121 $22,882 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 15/06/2018 $39,752 $65,352 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 18/07/2017 $67,028 $52,617 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 11/05/2016 $24,593 $24,800 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 18/08/2015 $18,566 $23,733 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alan Peter Heath Committee Member 13/06/2023
Andrzej Pawel Kowalczyk Committee Member 13/06/2023
Charlotte Rose ROOS Committee Member 13/06/2023
Shani Joyce Kowalczyk Chairperson 13/06/2023
Peter Guiney Committee Member 24/03/2021
Lorraine Guiney Committee Member 1/01/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew Campbell Committee Member 13/06/2023
Jessica Vaughan Committee Member 13/06/2023
Joanne Esparagoza Treasurer 13/06/2023
Neville Harrod Committee Member 13/06/2023
Robert Roos Secretary 13/06/2023
Taylor Noble Chairperson 13/06/2023
Bruce Neale Chairperson 1/02/2022
Charlene Bartlett Treasurer 24/03/2021
David Netherton Burrowes Chairperson 24/03/2021
Neville Harrod Committee Member 24/03/2021
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/06/2023 NOC019
13/06/2023 NOC018
5/07/2017 NOC010
17/05/2016 NOC009
10/08/2015 NOC008
17/07/2014 NOC007
19/06/2013 AR007
16/07/2012 AR006
1/07/2011 AR005

Charity Documents


Notices

This entity was removed from a single entity group (CC42351) on 16 June 2023.

load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.