pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Campaign for Wool New Zealand Trust
CC50227
N/A
Registered

Registration details

17/02/2014
December 31

Address for service

C/- Gardiner Knobloch Ltd
PO Box 145
Napier
4140
C/- Gardiner Knobloch Ltd
15 Shakespeare Road
Napier
4140

Charity's other details

06 8355018


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote the benefits of wool, to educate children and the general public.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Health, Environment / conservation, Care / protection of animals, International activities, Fund-raising

Voluntary bodies other than charities

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, Animals, General public

Entity Structure

Run by a Board of Trustees. Provides project based education to targeted audiences.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 2/04/2023 $571,110 $678,569
30/06/2022 30/03/2022 $583,907 $659,608
30/06/2021 31/05/2021 $534,454 $448,081
30/06/2020 7/05/2020 $630,212 $427,978
30/06/2019 4/05/2019 $673,581 $429,943
30/06/2018 16/04/2018 $516,994 $429,990
30/06/2017 2/05/2017 $642,975 $626,729
30/06/2016 3/05/2016 $612,249 $662,639
30/06/2015 13/04/2015 $522,192 $479,041

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ryan James Cosgrove Chairperson 14/12/2021
Rick Powdrell Trustee 20/11/2018
Tom O'Sullivan Trustee 20/11/2018
Sandra Faulkner Trustee 30/09/2016
Craig Bruce Smith Trustee 17/02/2014
Phillipa Anne Evelyn Wright Trustee 5/12/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Richard Patrick Kells Trustee 28/03/2023
Ewan Gardiner Accountant 31/12/2021
Guy Donald Joseph Wellwood Lawyer 31/12/2021
Stephen John Fookes Trustee 20/11/2018
Renata Apatu Trustee 15/06/2018
Dean Robert Harrison Trustee 31/12/2015
Bruce Craig Smith Trustee 17/02/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/07/2023 NOC021
16/08/2022 NOC019
20/05/2022 NOC018
12/12/2018 NOC013
23/11/2018 NOC012
23/11/2018 NOC011
2/02/2018 NOC009
16/01/2017 NOC007
25/10/2016 NOC006
20/10/2016 NOC005

Charity Documents