Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


RMH South Island Trust
Ronald McDonald House South Island
CC24375
9429042946199
Registered

Registration details

13/05/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 1463
Christchurch
8140
33 Cashel Street
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8013

Charity's other details

03 377 3311
03 377 3414
https://www.facebook.com/RonaldMcDonaldHouseSouthIsland/
https://twitter.com/rmhsouth
https://www.instagram.com/rmhsouth/


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

- To own, establish and manage a Ronald McDonald house in the Canterbury region. - To provide a facility, to create an environment for the families of children suffering cancer and other life threatening diseases. - To encourage the public to participate in the work of the trust - To do other acts that would promote the attainment of the objectives of the trust.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides accommodation to families who have travelled to Christchurch for care of their child at one of Christchurchs Hospitals.

Accommodation / housing

Health, Social services, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Children / young people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

RMH South Island Trust is an incorporated trust comprising of a Chairman/Trustee, Deputy Chairman/Trustee, Treasurer/Trustee, 7 Trustees, 6 full-time and 7 part-time team members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 31/07/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2023 $886,952 $1,004,325 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 22/06/2022 $2,354,617 $2,112,515 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 8/07/2021 $2,425,327 $1,561,291 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 31/07/2020 1/07/2020 $2,841,916 $1,532,466 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 30/07/2019 $2,542,378 $1,561,887 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 30/05/2018 $2,411,586 $1,430,162 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 5/07/2017 $2,348,656 $1,402,053 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 26/05/2016 $2,304,819 $1,413,175 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 19/06/2015 $2,225,144 $1,347,146 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sharon Ann Cocker Secretary 8/09/2021
Morgan Stanford Anthony Walker Trustee Intern 20/07/2021
Julie Corrin Hands Trustee 21/07/2020
Wendy May Schmidt Trustee 21/07/2020
Steffany Rachel Davis Accounts Administrator 17/02/2020
Christopher James Youngman Trustee 17/05/2016
Graham Muir Chairman 4/09/2014
David William Whalley Deputy Chairman/Trustee 23/07/2014
David Kipp Alexander Trustee / Treasurer 14/05/2008
Janetta Margaret Skiba Trustee 14/05/2008
loading image for pagination

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mandy Kay Kennedy Secretary 8/09/2021
Gavin Mark Abbot Trustee 1/05/2021
Paul Deavoll Chairman/Trustee 14/07/2020
Stuart Alexander Leck Trustee 22/05/2018
Robert Lindsay Aitken Trustee 13/02/2018
Susan Tansey Trustee 17/05/2016
Amanda Cooper-davies Trustee 19/03/2013
Pauline Clark Trustee 30/11/2012
Dorothy Robyn Gordon Trustee 15/07/2012
Lorelei Giselle Mason Trustee 31/12/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/11/2020 NOC021
6/08/2020 NOC020
5/08/2020 NOC019
24/05/2018 NOC014
21/06/2017 NOC012
29/06/2016 NOC011
12/08/2015 NOC010
7/07/2015 NOC009
6/07/2015 NOC008
26/06/2013 AR006
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.