Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


St Ronans Presbyterian Church Eastbourne
CC52108
N/A
Registered

Registration details

14/07/2015
June 30

Address for service

St Ronan's Presbyterian Church
234 Muritai Road
Eastbourne
Lower Hutt
5013

Charity's other details

(04) 562 8753
-
-
-
-


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provides religious activities

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

Children / young people, General public

Entity Structure

Society or Institution

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 22/12/2023 $65,783 $79,259 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 23/12/2022 $55,876 $85,754 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 4/02/2022 $107,038 $60,464 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 24/11/2020 $64,165 $104,387 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 23/01/2020 $74,752 $74,530 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 4/11/2018 $90,263 $127,810 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 26/01/2018 $87,025 $65,829 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 23/02/2017 $96,608 $96,033 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Peter Frederick Burke Treasurer 26/01/2018
Reginald Joseph Weeks Pastoral 26/01/2018
Alexander Lang Parish clerk 29/06/2015
Colin Dalziel Pastoral/Education 29/06/2015
Simon Shaw Property 29/06/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Michelle Bolger Communications 26/09/2021
John Harris Treasurer 26/01/2018
Paul Batchelor Outreach 16/03/2017

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.