pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Rourou, Vodafone Aotearoa Foundation
CC22493
N/A
Registered

Registration details

2/04/2008
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Vodafone New Zealand Foundation 3/04/2008
Te Rourou, Vodafone Aotearoa Foundation 11/02/2021

Address for service

Private Bag 92161
Victoria Street West
Auckland
1142
68-76 Taharoto Road
Takapuna
Auckland
0622

Charity's other details

09 355 2000
09 355 2001
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/VodafoneNZFoundation


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objectives of the Foundation are for such charitable purposes and/or institutions as the trustee shall in its absolute discretion determine. In particular, the Foundation is focussed on funding and supporting organisations and individuals working to enable vulnerable young New Zealanders to live lives they value. We support those which use a positive youth development approach to their work.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Education / training / research

Social services, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Other charities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Te Rourou, Vodafone Aotearoa Foundation is a trust. The trustee is Te Rourou, Vodafone Aotearoa Foundation Tāpui (Limited).

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 26/09/2021 $2,500,307 $2,039,319
30/09/2020 21/09/2020 $2,744,716 $2,968,465
30/09/2019 10/07/2019 $2,728,852 $3,039,780
30/09/2018 10/09/2018 $2,681,704 $2,297,306
30/09/2017 13/09/2017 $2,971,544 $3,373,036
30/09/2016 28/09/2016 $2,710,427 $3,081,127
30/09/2015 30/09/2015 $3,084,551 $2,045,608
30/09/2014 10/09/2014 $2,202,049 $2,048,443
30/09/2013 25/09/2013 $1,976,910 $2,499,930
30/09/2012 28/09/2012 $3,943,453 $2,697,428

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Te Rourou, Vodafone Aotearoa Foundation Tāpui (Limited) Trustee of a Trust 11/02/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Vodafone New Zealand Foundation Limited Trustee of a Trust 11/02/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/06/2021 NOC015
11/05/2015 NOC008
24/09/2013 AR006
16/09/2010 NOC003
7/09/2009 AR002

Charity Documents