Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Auto Stewardship New Zealand
CC59525
9429051756031
Registered

Registration details

11/08/2021
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 40
Hastings
4156
308 Queen Street East
Hastings 4122
Hastings
4122

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objectives of Auto Stewardship New Zealand are: • Be the Product Stewardship Organisation (PSO) which governs the product stewardship scheme for auto industry related regulated stewardship schemes, including tyres declared as priority product under Section 9 of the Waste Minimisation Act 2008, and all that entails; • Receive and administer funds “levied” on consumers for the purpose of managing the national bank of “end of life tyres” within the regulation framework; • Promote the aims of product stewardship in the auto industry to the benefit and advantage of all New Zealanders; • Collaborate with other developed programmes that may not be within Auto Stewardship New Zealand, but which benefit stewardship for the auto industry; • Promote the adoption of programmes by the auto industry for environmentally sound waste management practices; and • Respect and implement the dual heritage of the partners of Te Tiriti o Waitangi

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Environment / conservation

General public

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Auto Stewardship New Zealand Limited (Non-Registered Entity) N/A
Tyrewise Limited (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
29/02/2024 31/08/2024 27/08/2024 $577,784 $577,784 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 18/12/2023 $993,755 $993,755 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 20/12/2022 $219,736 $219,736 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 8 months from 1 July 2023 to 29 February 2024.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Peter Andrew Holley Trustee 1/05/2024
Samantha Heilkje Sharif Trustee 1/05/2024
Peter James Ryan Trustee 22/11/2022
Sturrock Charles Saunders Trustee 22/11/2022
David Vinsen Trustee 4/11/2021
Mark Gilbert Trustee Chair 29/09/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kerryn Mark Downey Trustee 13/10/2023
Adele Claire Rose Trustee 29/03/2023
Graeme Douglas Norton Trustee 29/09/2021

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/10/2024 NOC014
10/07/2024 NOC012
7/06/2024 NOC011
7/12/2023 NOC009
31/03/2023 NOC008
31/03/2023 NOC007
16/03/2023 NOC006
13/12/2022 NOC004
21/10/2021 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.