Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Surf Life Saving New Zealand Incorporated
CC38280
9429042956587
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 39129
Wellington Mail Centre
Lower Hutt
5045
PELORUS SPORT HOUSE
93 Hutt Park Road
Moera
Lower Hutt
5010

Charity's other details

04 5600 383
04 5600-0400


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The charitable purposes of SLSNZ are primarily to prevent drowning and injury of the general public while swimming and undertaking activities at beaches and other aquatic environments throughout New Zealand, by providing lifesaving, patrol services and other programmes and services.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Member and Public Education/ Oversight and Prevention of Drowning and Water Safety

Other (please state)

(Drowning Prevention and Water Safety/ Lifeguard Services), Education / training / research, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, NZ Beach Goers

Entity Structure

Surf Life Saving New Zealand Inc (SLSNZ) is the charity representing 74 Surf Life Clubs in New Zealand. About 17,000 people are members of SLSNZ. The 74 clubs are grouped for consultation and programme delivery purposes into local regions, and are supported by SLSNZ staff. SLSNZ has a Governance Board of 8 people. The Board employs the Chief Executive and the CE delivers an annual management plan to support the Board's strategies.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Surf Life Saving New Zealand Foundation CC53895

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 30/10/2023 $22,550,317 $21,321,542 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 11/10/2022 $20,282,098 $20,160,979 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 30/09/2021 $18,989,452 $18,367,418 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 16/08/2021 $11,197,000 $10,572,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 16/10/2019 $10,992,023 $10,605,674 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 24/01/2019 $10,352,014 $9,955,018 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 1/11/2017 $9,541,790 $9,437,820 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 1/12/2016 $8,855,000 $8,594,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 21/09/2015 $9,086,000 $8,435,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2014 31/12/2014 22/09/2014 $9,412,055 $8,793,128 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michael Gordon Barker Board member 23/09/2023
Cameron Burrow Board Member 17/09/2022
Judy Ellen Campbell Board Member 23/09/2021
Marie Weaver Board Member 8/01/2021
Emma Sutherland Board Member 19/09/2020
Mark Robberds Board Member 22/09/2018
Paul Ian Carlyon Chairman 24/09/2017
Kelvyn Eglinton Board Member 21/04/2017
Vanessa Winning Board Member 24/09/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kathleen Barry-Piceno Board Member 16/09/2022
Richard Briggs Board Member 21/10/2020
Phil Holden Board Member 25/09/2020
Brent Warner Board Member 19/09/2020
Trevor Taylor Board Member 21/09/2019
Graham Crombie Board Member 13/02/2019
Colin Weatherall Board Member 22/09/2018
Joe Pope Board Member 23/09/2017
Geoffrey Malcolm Hamilton Director 24/03/2017
Richard Stolwerk Board Member 24/09/2016
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/11/2023 NOC042
21/09/2023 NOC040
20/09/2022 NOC037
23/09/2021 NOC035
8/01/2021 NOC034
10/11/2020 NOC032
10/11/2020 NOC031
28/09/2020 NOC030
23/10/2019 NOC029
30/09/2019 NOC027
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.