pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Prison Care Ministries
Prison Care Ministries Trust
CC22440
9429043122073
Registered

Registration details

1/04/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 16192
Urlich
Hamilton
3245
70 Kent Street
Frankton
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

(07) 8473115
Facebook icon image
facebook.com/prisoncareministries


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide an environment for meaningful reintegration. To provide both accommodation and rehabilitative support for men released from prison and those involved in the Criminal Justice System. Achieved by building relationships with prisoners, assisting them to regain independence on release and supporting them as they reintegrate with family and community. To reduce re offending and ensure a safer community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides religious services / activities

Accommodation / housing

Social services, Religious activities

Other (please state)

(Prisoners, released prisoners and family.)

Entity Structure

Trust Structure: Prison Care Ministries' Trust Deed states the membership of the Trust shall not be less than 3 or exceed 6 in number and that the role of Chairperson must be filled by a Trustee Prison Care Ministries operations are managed by a team of 4 paid employees: 1 full time Manager, 1 fulltime Office Manager, 1 fulltime Reintegration Officer 1 part time Councilor, 1 casual Support person. 12 Volunteers support the team with various activities.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2022 29/09/2022 $317,296 $330,762
30/09/2021 20/09/2021 $376,089 $353,926
30/09/2020 10/09/2020 $364,746 $389,531
30/09/2019 17/09/2019 $332,487 $337,768
30/09/2018 22/08/2018 $348,980 $338,516
30/09/2017 26/09/2017 $317,679 $323,935
30/09/2016 9/09/2016 $325,823 $276,963
30/09/2015 4/09/2015 $229,538 $222,418
30/09/2014 21/09/2014 $213,869 $231,808

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alan Vink Trustee 15/04/2021
Robbie Ahu Trustee 15/09/2016
Alexander Shepherd Trustee 2/04/2008
Jill McMillan Trustee 2/04/2008
Maraenui Taituha Trustee 2/04/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Paddy Colley Trustee 14/04/2022
Bruce John McDowall Trustee 11/02/2021
Pam Neilson Trustee 13/09/2020
Geoffrey McMillan Trustee 25/11/2016
Leonard Caley Trustee 3/10/2016
Michael Marama Te Ahuru Trustee 31/03/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/10/2021 NOC027
21/09/2021 NOC024
17/06/2021 NOC023
24/03/2021 NOC022
7/10/2020 NOC021
4/05/2017 NOC014
6/12/2016 NOC013
6/12/2016 NOC012
27/10/2016 NOC011
18/08/2016 NOC009

Charity Documents