pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


City Impact Church
CC24685
9429042592303
Registered

Registration details

21/05/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 35211
Browns Bay
Auckland
753
794 East Coast Road
Oteha
Auckland
630

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Christian Charitable Aims - To be a church that preaches the Gospel message of Jesus Christ and to see believers grow into commited and mature disciples.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Community development, Promotion of volunteering

Other (please state)

(Our attendees (members) are from all age groups and ethnicities. Mostly from the immediate communities but some from further afield. New Zealanders and migrants. )

Entity Structure

A Charitable Trust - A Not-For-Profit organisation governed by its Board of Trustees.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
City Impact Church Balclutha Trust CC26764
City Impact Church Education Limited CC24681
City Impact Church Invercargill CC24679
City Impact Church Mt Wellington CC45393
City Impact Church Queenstown Education Limited CC24680
City Impact Church Queenstown Incorporated CC24672
City Impact Church School Limited CC24676
City Impact Queenstown Enterprises Limited CC24674
COMMUNITY IMPACT TRUST CC47423
Origin Media Trust CC47431
The City Impact Churches International Trust CC33199

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2021 29/09/2021 $17,544,137 $15,884,670
31/12/2020 28/10/2020 $13,787,677 $13,974,968
31/12/2019 26/12/2019 $13,674,451 $13,610,632
30/09/2018 29/09/2018 $13,220,464 $13,474,767
30/09/2017 27/09/2017 $13,745,053 $13,007,176
30/09/2016 6/10/2016 $13,552,397 $12,755,486
30/09/2015 30/09/2015 $15,293,828 $13,695,721
30/06/2014 1/07/2014 $10,366,000 $10,260,000
30/06/2013 1/07/2013 $9,157,268 $9,289,249

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Graham Andrew Anthony Burger Trustee 3/12/2009
Beverly Ann Mortlock Trustee 18/08/1999
Paul Gavin Adams Trustee 18/08/1999
Susan Ann Adams Trustee 18/08/1999
Peter James Mortlock Trustee 22/05/1984

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/11/2014 NOC007
2/07/2012 AR006
15/03/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents