pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


ORCA Research Trust
CC10041
9429043009572
Registered

Registration details

28/02/2007
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 402043
Tutukaka
153
754 Matapouri Road
RD 3
Whangarei
173

Charity's other details

09 4343043
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/OrcaResearchTrust/

Oceania

Australia, Papua New Guinea

South America

Argentina

North America

Canada, United States

Europe

Germany, Netherlands, Spain, United Kingdom


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our purpose is to assist in, promote, preserve and carry out scientific research on wild & free orca, other marine mammals and the marine environment. Our mission statement is "To Protect Orca & their Habitat, through Conservation, Education & Scientific Research"

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides educational & conservation oriented research

Care / protection of animals

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, International activities, Fund-raising, Research and Conservation of Animals

Animals

Children / young people, General public, Dept of Conservation & other entities eg councils

Entity Structure

The organisational structure: The trust is administered by a Board of Trustees. Currently there are three trustees

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 20/12/2020 $192,250 $103,100
29/02/2020 16/06/2020 $68,413 $74,472
31/12/2018 11/12/2018 $61,966 $61,981
30/09/2017 28/11/2017 $82,744 $68,910
30/09/2016 28/11/2016 $112,648 $75,327
30/09/2015 8/11/2015 $61,085 $52,987
30/09/2014 30/09/2014 $86,893 $110,984
30/09/2013 30/10/2013 $46,153 $78,976
30/09/2012 16/10/2012 $34,161 $91,500

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David Ashby Trustee 9/02/2007
Frederick Visser Trustee 9/02/2007
Ingrid Visser Secretary 9/02/2007
Terry Hardie Trustee 9/02/2007

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/01/2008 AR002

Charity Documents