pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Destiny Church Wellington
Destiny Church Wellington Trust
CC31401
9429043086894
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
February 28

Address for service

PO Box 13707
Johnsonville
Wellington
6440
Level 5
105 High Street
Lower Hutt
Lower Hutt
5019

Charity's other details

027 576 0855
Facebook icon image
Destiny Church Wellington
Destiny Wgtn (TikTok)


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide religious services, activities and programs to the lower North Island region,that support, educate, help rehabilitate and equip men and women and young people from all walks of life, to be whole both mentally and spiritually and to also become healthy, productive members of society who in in turn will impact their families and communities. We have free community programmes which are holistic, operating from Palmerston North through to Horowhenua, Wairarapa, Wellington & Hutt Valley.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Employment, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Care / protection of animals, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The structure is a Board of Trustees (four people), three paid staff, and 50+ core volunteers who who are involved in local church ministries and also help run our programmes throughout the wider community.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2022 4/09/2022 $430,224 $379,714
31/08/2021 17/05/2022 $393,340 $337,929
31/10/2020 30/10/2020 $390,750 $363,870
31/08/2019 30/08/2019 $348,737 $372,636
31/08/2018 2/09/2018 $340,064 $344,884
31/08/2017 30/08/2017 $327,930 $308,022
31/08/2016 28/08/2016 $256,082 $235,331
31/08/2015 27/08/2015 $262,077 $266,706
31/08/2014 2/10/2014 $319,188 $330,005
31/08/2013 31/08/2013 $391,840 $420,225

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Eden Lee O'Connor Trustee 1/04/2019
Epirosa Robertson Trustee 29/08/2016
Heker Robertson Trustee 1/06/2013
Samuelu Fuataga Trustee 1/06/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Hannah Radclavina Huirangi Tamaki Chairman 1/04/2019
Ana Miriam Draper Trustee 24/12/2013
John James Ferris Trustee 1/06/2013
Jean Pearl Hunt Trustee 26/06/2012
Michael Draper Trustee 13/09/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/05/2019 NOC010
29/08/2016 NOC007
5/06/2014 NOC006
31/08/2013 AR006
31/08/2012 AR005

Charity Documents