Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Harmony Centre Trust
Harmony Church
CC32317
9429043093342
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Name change history

Name Effective Date
Harmony Trust 30/06/2008
Harmony Centre Trust 27/10/2008

Address for service

PO Box 33430
Barrington
Christchurch
8244
220 Antigua Street
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

0279399195
https://www.facebook.com/HARMONY-CHURCH


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Passion for God and Compassion for People with a vision to know God and make him known.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

Entity Structure

Board of trustees with senior leaders.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 31/03/2024 6/03/2024 $1,095,217 $1,194,248 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 31/03/2023 12/04/2023 $1,232,131 $1,254,069 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2022 $1,251,164 $1,193,554 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 15/02/2021 17/02/2021 $1,137,903 $1,075,743 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 31/10/2019 16/01/2020 $901,719 $852,699 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 30/09/2018 $893,304 $772,282 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 29/09/2017 $708,832 $1,043,317 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 12/12/2016 $654,575 $557,043 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 16/12/2015 $346,565 $325,259 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Medona Gretta Cherry Trustee 16/02/2023
Gus Walkden Trustee 3/11/2021
Doug Pflaum Trustee 14/04/2014
Catherine Elizabeth Hoekendijk Trustee 30/06/2008
Gideon Hoekendijk Trustee 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Annette Delaine Richards Trustee 29/03/2023
Richard David Evans Trustee 29/03/2023
Rick Mardon Trustee 31/10/2020
Jeffrey Irving Trustee 31/07/2018
Barrie Edward Malloch Trustee 14/04/2014
Mike John Burford Trustee 14/04/2014
Robert Paul Janssen Trustee 10/05/2010
Michelle Julie Heazlewood Trustee 7/04/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/10/2023 NOC021
13/04/2023 NOC018
2/03/2022 NOC015
2/03/2022 NOC014
28/04/2016 NOC007
10/05/2012 AR004
14/09/2010 AR003
4/05/2010 NOC003
11/11/2009 NOC002
29/09/2009 AR002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.