pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Whanau Hou - Grovetown Lagoon Incorporated
CC28322
9429043054268
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 443
Blenheim
7240

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
Grovetown Lagoon@grovetownlagoontewhanauhou


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Reaforestation of Grovetown Lagoon area and the formation of a public walking/cycling track around the Lagoon. Education of public and school children about native plants and bird life in the area.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Habitat Enhancement), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Environment / conservation

Sport / recreation

General public

Children / young people, Wildlife

Entity Structure

Incorporated Charity

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 22/08/2023 $25,656 $22,335
30/09/2022 1/06/2022 $29,898 $24,332
30/09/2021 6/08/2021 $27,192 $20,203
30/09/2020 4/08/2020 $36,975 $103,928
30/09/2019 3/07/2019 $100,505 $18,920
30/09/2018 13/08/2018 $18,975 $34,929
30/09/2017 2/07/2017 $83,548 $98,518
31/12/2016 18/07/2016 $50,669 $25,581
31/12/2015 17/10/2015 $25,762 $8,067
31/12/2014 16/10/2015 $26,545 $26,700

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Tracey Williams Committee Member 29/11/2023
Caroline Cornelius Committee Member 22/08/2023
George Stafford Committee Member 25/07/2023
Guy Gardiner Committee Member 25/07/2023
Kereana Norton Committee Member 25/07/2023
Phil Bradfield Committee Member 25/07/2023
Ben Minehan Committee Member 14/05/2023
Peter Hamill Committee Member 21/07/2020
Rosanne Anderson Committee Member 1/12/2016
Justine Johnson Secretary 4/09/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Nicola Haisman Committee Member 22/08/2023
Tim barton Chair 25/07/2023
Cynthia Brooks Committee Member 15/11/2022
Howard Sadd Committee Member 21/07/2020
Johnny Joseph Committee Member 21/07/2020
Phil Bradfield Committee Member 21/07/2020
David Hayes Committee Member 1/07/2015
Lynda Neame Secretary 1/07/2015
Prue Wisheart Committee Member 1/07/2015
Rangi Joseph Committee Member 1/07/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/11/2023 NOC027
27/08/2023 NOC026
2/04/2023 NOC024
12/08/2020 NOC020
4/07/2019 NOC018
8/09/2017 NOC015
3/12/2016 NOC013
14/10/2016 NOC012
9/05/2016 NOC010
17/10/2015 NOC009

Charity Documents