pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Royal New Zealand Foundation Of The Blind Incorporated
Blind Low Vision NZ
CC21361
9429043230990
Registered

Registration details

25/02/2008
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Royal New Zealand Foundation Of The Blind 26/02/2008
Royal New Zealand Foundation Of The Blind Incorporated 26/09/2016

Address for service

Private Bag 99941
Newmarket
Auckland
1149
4 Maunsell Road
Parnell
Auckland
1052

Charity's other details

(09)3556900
(09)3660099


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Enable people who are blind or have low vision to be self-reliant and live the life they choose

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides services to blind visually - impaired, deafblind New Zealanders

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Social services, Employment, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Royal New Zealand Foundation of the Blind a charity which is a statutory body empowered by the Royal New Foundation of the Blind Act 2002, an Incorporated Society and registered under the Charities Act 2005. Blind Low Vision NZ is controlled by an elected Board of Directors.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Foundation Properties Limited CC50784
Foundation Ventures Limited CC55844
Foundation Village Limited CC57618
The Bledisloe-Royston Trust CC44156

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 7/12/2022 $38,033,000 $33,288,000
31/12/2021 21/10/2021 $42,526,000 $35,869,000
31/12/2020 1/12/2020 $36,172,000 $37,363,000
31/12/2019 6/11/2019 $39,459,000 $37,731,000
31/12/2018 21/11/2018 $43,778,000 $36,572,000
31/12/2017 21/09/2017 $40,825,000 $36,037,000
31/12/2016 30/09/2016 $37,686,000 $38,420,000
31/12/2015 24/11/2015 $35,302,000 $34,226,000
31/12/2014 20/11/2014 $31,875,000 $29,726,000
31/12/2013 18/11/2013 $36,270,000 $28,483,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Richard Thomas Patete Director 13/11/2021
Ronald John Charles Scott Director 18/05/2021
Donna Moana McCaskill Director 15/11/2020
Robert John Billings Director 10/11/2019
John Joseph Mulka Chief Executive 26/09/2019
Martine Abel-Williamson Director 4/05/2019
Fraser Thomas Alexander Director 11/11/2017
Gregory Thomas Hurn Chief Financial Officer 23/01/2017
Clive Johannes Lansink Director 12/11/2016
Judith Small Director 9/11/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Richard Bond Hoskin Directory 13/05/2022
Carolyn Weston Director 13/11/2021
Robert David Greenberg Director 13/11/2021
Deborah Lynne Boyd Director 19/07/2021
Peter Hoskin Director 14/05/2021
Richard Bond Hoskin Director 27/11/2020
Keith Appleton Director 14/11/2020
Deborah Lynne Boyd Director 10/11/2019
Sandra Dennice Budd Chief Executive 30/06/2019
Nicola Owen Director 12/04/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/12/2021 NOC034
29/11/2021 NOC033
28/07/2021 NOC031
24/05/2021 NOC030
1/12/2020 NOC028
26/11/2020 NOC027
18/03/2020 NOC026
16/03/2020 NOC025
13/03/2020 NOC024
7/11/2019 NOC023

Charity Documents