pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Ururangi Trust
CC43092
N/A
Deregistered
01/06/2018

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$830,000
$805,000

The Charity’s accumulated assets and income have been:


Below are details of Ururangi Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

4/09/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 63
Ngaruawahia
3742
2 Eyre Street
Ngaruawahia
3720

Charity's other details

07 824 7678
07 824 7681


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To maintain and further tribal unity and identity of Waikato Tainui and the custody and preservation through the kaahui ariki of the belief and customs of waikatotonga

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Tribal Unity), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Marae on reservation land, Community development, Social services, Employment, International activities, Promotion of volunteering, Tribal administration within culture & heritage

Other (please state)

(Waikato-Tainui Beneficiaries), Children / young people, Older people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The trust is represented by 2 trustees who are directors of the trustee company.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2017 1/09/2017 $1,921,370 $1,985,447
30/09/2016 18/09/2016 $1,700,075 $1,683,595
30/09/2015 3/09/2015 $1,664,193 $1,611,367
30/09/2014 25/09/2014 $1,503,234 $1,463,250
30/09/2013 17/10/2013 $1,430,227 $1,550,588
30/09/2012 28/08/2013 $1,331,000 $1,511,000
30/09/2011 28/08/2013 $1,205,000 $1,614,697
30/09/2010 8/11/2010 $1,370,706 $1,087,691
30/09/2009 9/04/2010 $1,263,000 $784,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ururangi Limited Trustee N/A

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/08/2013 AR006
26/08/2013 AR005
8/11/2010 AR003

Charity Documents