Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Alan Duff Charitable Foundation
Duffy Books in Homes
CC30965
9429042575498
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 132146
Sylvia Park
Mount Wellington
Auckland
1644
2 Railway Lane
Otahuhu
Auckland
1062

Charity's other details

09 259 5690
09 270 7416
www.facebook.com/duffybooks
instragam.com/duffybooks


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Alan Duff Charitable Foundation, better known as Duffy Books in Homes, is proud to provide free books to over 100,000 New Zealand children. Our Vision: To inspire a love of books in Duffy children so they become adults who inspire a love of reading

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides Books), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Community development, Literacy

Children / young people

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Schools

Entity Structure

The financial statements of the Foundation have been prepared in accordance with the Tier 2 PBE standards and disclosure concessions have been applied. The Foundation is eligible to report in accordance with Tier 2 PBE standards because it does not have public accountability and it is not large.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2024 31/12/2024 2/12/2024 $5,588,959 $5,045,707 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2023 31/12/2023 10/12/2023 $4,319,278 $4,537,495 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2022 31/12/2022 13/12/2022 $4,282,701 $3,923,655 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2021 31/12/2021 5/12/2021 $3,651,042 $4,076,543 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2020 31/12/2020 30/11/2020 $3,910,467 $4,068,643 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2019 31/12/2019 12/01/2020 $4,015,187 $4,084,572 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2018 31/12/2018 17/12/2019 $3,600,312 $3,973,287 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2017 31/12/2017 18/12/2017 $3,620,108 $3,880,290 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2016 31/12/2016 10/01/2017 $3,797,457 $3,526,525 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/06/2015 31/12/2015 4/02/2016 $4,153,137 $3,930,409 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Fiona McAree-Ngaau Trustee 7/11/2024
Bryan Curtis Trustee 9/02/2023
Kevin Murray Drinkwater Chairman 20/11/2014
Libby Limbrick Trustee 17/05/2012
Tone Kolose Trustee 17/05/2012
Carl George Board of Trustee 18/11/2010
Bruce George Plested Trustee 3/05/2005
Alan Duff Trustee 28/04/2003

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Felicity Ruth Anderson Trustee 9/02/2023
Robin Matthew Brooke Trustee 10/11/2022
Bernice Mene Trustee 12/05/2022
Terry Ruhi Morrison Trustee 30/11/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/01/2025 NOC021
29/03/2023 NOC018
24/01/2023 NOC017
7/07/2015 NOC007
21/11/2012 AR005
22/06/2012 NOC003
30/11/2011 AR004
19/09/2011 NOC002
7/12/2010 AR003

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.