pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Think Tank Charitable Trust
Te Muka Rau Charitable Trust
CC24822
9429043001583
Registered

Registration details

25/05/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 15212
Miramar
Wellington
6243
19 Beere Haven Road
Seatoun
Wellington
6022

Charity's other details

(027) 489 2690


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

(a) To provide financial support and assistance within New Zealand for families and organisations who are "at risk" or economically disadvantaged. (b) To provide financial support and assistance within New Zealand for people with disabilities and organisations working with people with disabilities. (c) To provide financial support for and assistance within New Zealand for cultural development projects and support organisations involved with cultural development, educational institutions and organisations at the primary, secondary and tertiary levels. (d) To provide financial support for such other charitable initiatives having a public benefit within New Zealand and beneficial to the community which will be determined from time to time by the Trustees.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Social services

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage

Other (please state)

(People and organisations that support our Purpose.)

Entity Structure

A Charitable Trust, run and governed by the Trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/11/2023 15/11/2023 $88,713 $114,124
30/09/2022 25/08/2022 $100,371 $90,015
29/10/2021 20/10/2021 $55,288 $70,450
30/09/2020 25/09/2020 $17,785 $120,833
30/09/2019 16/09/2019 $11,043 $24,646
31/10/2018 2/10/2018 $80,495 $66,737
30/09/2017 3/12/2017 $2,783 $49,338
30/09/2016 27/10/2016 $14,049 $16,614
30/09/2015 29/10/2015 $19,196 $51,668
30/09/2014 27/10/2014 $16,918 $62,057

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Pekaira Jude Rei Trustee 31/08/2017
Seumas Michael Fantham Trustee 31/08/2017
David Ari Moskovitz Trustee 29/11/2002
Kathleen Frykberg Trustee 29/11/2002

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jennifer Mary Gill Trustee 6/03/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/10/2022 NOC012
26/09/2017 NOC005
26/09/2010 AR003

Charity Documents