Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Central Otago Clutha Trails Limited
CC51050
9429041140895
Registered

Registration details

10/16/2014
March 31

Address for service

5 Briar Crescent
Alexandra
9320
42 Ventry Street
Alexandra 9320
Alexandra
9320

Charity's other details



Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Is to maintain the purposes of the Roxburgh Gorge Trail Charitable Trust and the Clutha Gold Trail Charitable Trust being the shareholders of the company. That purpose being to supervise, finance, and maintain the pedestrian and cycle trail from Alexandra to Lawrence in order to facilitate and promote public use and enjoyment of this area.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Community development

Environment / conservation, Sport / recreation

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Incorporated under the Companies Act 1993 on 26 March 2014.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
3/31/2024 9/30/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
3/31/2023 9/30/2023 9/18/2023 $340,803 $324,593 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2022 9/30/2022 9/19/2022 $274,430 $260,924 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2021 9/30/2021 9/19/2021 $189,881 $186,245 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2020 9/30/2020 9/28/2020 $316,779 $320,745 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2019 9/30/2019 9/29/2019 $125,332 $111,052 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2018 9/30/2018 9/26/2018 $149,206 $146,763 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2017 9/30/2017 11/24/2017 $124,191 $99,019 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2016 9/30/2016 9/27/2017 $68,255 $74,803 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
3/31/2015 9/30/2015 9/6/2017 $38,725 $26,439 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David Vollweiler Director 9/14/2023
Anna Grace Mickell Director 8/15/2019
Barrie John Wills Director 3/26/2014
Murray Alexander Paterson Director 3/26/2014
Roderick John Peirce Director 3/26/2014
Robert Alexander Roy Treasurer 5/16/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Stephen Foster Jeffery Director 9/14/2023
Desley Harrex Director 12/1/2018

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.