Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Young Men's Christian Association of Invercargill Charitable Trust
CC20773
9429042971559
Registered

Registration details

28/01/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 183
Invercargill
9840
77 Tay Street
Invercargill
9810

Charity's other details

(03)2182989
https://www.facebook.com/ymcasouth


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Education & social services, health and well being, community development, out of school care, youth leadership, recreation, environment & conservation, promotion of volunteering

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Charitable community organisation

Community development

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Social services, Sport / recreation, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Southland YMCA Education Limited CC25198
YMCA Southland Limited CC40741

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2024 30/06/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 20/05/2024 $195,074 $149,059 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 23/05/2023 $201,241 $117,527 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 Processing $165,714 $160,919 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 20/06/2021 $532,019 $515,999 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2020 31/07/2020 30/07/2020 $475,765 $466,589 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2019 31/07/2019 29/05/2019 $448,538 $405,635 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2018 31/07/2018 28/06/2018 $443,782 $421,732 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2017 31/07/2017 13/06/2017 $482,702 $482,311 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/01/2016 31/07/2016 9/06/2016 $413,151 $773,367 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination
= Balance Date Change
- This annual return will cover the financial period between 1 Feb 2020- 31 Dec 2020 (11 months) due to a balance date change.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kylie McNeilly Trustee 11/06/2024
Nickoli Dean Hamlin Trustee 11/06/2024
Megan Louise Clark Trustee 11/07/2022
Kari Graber Trustee 12/07/2021
Bridget-Mary McGown Trustee 29/01/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Charlotte Melvin Trustee 6/11/2024
David Madden Trustee 16/07/2024
Paul Rabbitt Trustee 11/06/2024
Nick Evans Trustee 15/06/2023
Bryony Clarke Trustee 2/05/2023
Nathan Leo Burdon Trustee 24/08/2022
James Gilbert Harvey Trustee 13/06/2022
Sarah Mckenzie Trustee 15/02/2021
Leisa Ann heffernan Director 4/08/2020
Mark Bain Trustee 9/12/2019
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/11/2024 NOC037
21/08/2024 NOC036
24/06/2024 NOC035
21/05/2024 NOC033
23/06/2023 NOC032
23/05/2023 NOC030
22/11/2022 NOC029
22/11/2022 NOC028
29/06/2021 NOC025
6/11/2020 NOC023
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.