pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Pompe Network
CC54486
9429044424985
Registered

Registration details

18/04/2017
March 31

Address for service

181C Willow Park Drive
RD 11
Opaki
Masterton
5871

Charity's other details

0274069365
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/nzpompe/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/PompeNowWhat


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To offer support, information, friendship and hope to those affected by Pompe Disease

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Health, Fund-raising

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

We have a head office based in Masterton with elected committee members across New Zealand. There are five executive positions that constitute our governance board. We are affiliated with the International Pompe Association founded in the Netherlands.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2022 8/06/2022 $67,753 $18,183
30/09/2021 17/09/2021 $34,267 $46,616
30/09/2020 8/09/2020 $18,958 $35,712
30/09/2019 3/09/2019 $75,493 $29,956
30/09/2018 5/09/2018 $49,897 $35,109

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Robert Turner Committee Member 12/05/2019
Allyson Sarah Lock President 10/02/2017
Christine Ann Turner Secretary 10/02/2017
Samantha Emily Lenik Vice President 10/02/2017
Stephen Lock Treasurer 10/02/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Vaughan Thomas Secretary, NZ Pompe Network 22/03/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/05/2019 NOC005
13/05/2019 NOC004
29/10/2017 NOC002
11/10/2017 NOC001

Charity Documents