Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Advent Charitable Trust Board
The Advent Charitable Trust
CC45056
9429043189625
Registered

Registration details

1/09/2010
March 31

Address for service

10 Jarvis Court
Huntington
Hamilton
3210

Charity's other details

07 853 9795
https://www.facebook.com/TheWebsiteOfTheLord/

North America

United States

Asia

India

Europe

United Kingdom


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote and enhance an understanding and growth of the Christian Faith. Currently helping in Andhra Pradesh with a home for a homeless Pastor by funding his purchase of a section in a government subdivision where the government will soon be building the homes there at no charge to the new owners of the building sites. There are 9 books on ‘God Speaks ...’ now completed and being printed in 6”x 9” USA size books in Paper Printing Master Manuscripts with redesigned Philippine-based cover designers for Soft Cover and Hardback covers for PRINT ONLY Books and in ebooks in both ePub (Apple and their distributors) and Mobi Kindle (Amazon distributors) through two Publishers in The U.S.A. There are now also 9 further books completed and available as ‘God End-time Updates ...’ which are following in the footsteps of The 9 books above. The launching of these 19 books is being spread worldwide and extended with promotions. The Main Purpose ... these 19 Christian End-time

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(The trust is publishing in NZ and the U.S.A. 19 divinely dictated end-time Christian books entitled 'The End-time Psalms of God', plus four companion Books as The Flowers of God series.)

Religious activities

International activities, Fund-raising

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, General public

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust. There are no trading activities in NZ. The Trust's officer, Anthony A Eddy, attends to all aspects of the public face of the trust. He hears from, and acts as Scribe to, the Christian Living God for the Dictation of His books. These thirteen books are unique in both their presentation and their outlook for the future. They are Apostolic, Pentecostal, Charismatic, in their standing before God. We are coming into the time when these books are about to flower after a time of prepa

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2010 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2011.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 31/12/2023 10/10/2023 $56,316 $45,120 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 7/08/2022 $44,791 $54,690 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 25/07/2022 $48,561 $51,850 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 22/07/2020 $159,236 $162,363 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 15/08/2019 $61,273 $70,425 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 12/09/2018 $70,017 $53,719 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 19/09/2017 $72,635 $83,220 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 12/04/2017 $71,519 $71,481 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 12/04/2017 $16,870 $37,202 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 12/04/2017 $69,835 $51,449 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Adrienne Joy Eddy Trustee 18/05/2010
Anthony Alan Eddy Trustee 18/05/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/09/2013 AR004
5/12/2012 AR003
22/06/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.