pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Friends Of The Hocken Collections Incorporated
CC20114
9429042702771
Registered

Registration details

26/11/2007
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 6336
Dunedin North
Dunedin
9059
90 Anzac Avenue
Corner Anzac Avenue and Parry Street
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
Friends of the Hocken Collections


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote public awareness of and support for the various collections and services of the Hocken Collections. To encourage public financial support of the enhancement of the Hocken Collections and services. To provide the opportunity of association for all personas having an interest in the Collections and related activities of the Hocken Collections. To hold periodic meetings and produce publications of historic and cultural interest. To co-operate with similar societies within New Zealand and elsewhere. in the best interests of preserving historic and other records for the public benefit. Also, making historic resources available by contributing towards the microfilming of historic newspapers.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Fund-raising

General public

Entity Structure

Members who pay annual membership or a Life membership Members may also donate towards the activities of the organisation

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 7/12/2022 $3,407 $2,444
31/12/2021 21/12/2021 $3,162 $7,604
31/12/2020 16/12/2020 $4,755 $6,255
31/12/2019 6/12/2019 $4,196 $1,488
31/12/2018 7/01/2019 $7,961 $6,440
31/12/2017 8/02/2018 $7,214 $16,848
31/12/2016 9/05/2017 $7,242 $14,373
31/12/2015 25/01/2016 $8,754 $7,376
31/12/2014 11/02/2015 $6,761 $1,959

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sarah Gallagher committee member 5/12/2021
Claire Christine Matthewson committee member 13/01/2020
Lorraine Pya Isaacs committee member 20/11/2019
Carol Anne Melville Treasurer 15/11/2017
Louise Marjorie Croot President 20/07/2016
Thomas Warden Hastings Brooking Committee member 20/07/2016
Anna Ruth Blackman Ex-oficio member 23/08/2013
Geoffrey Mark Hughes Hon. Secretary 23/08/2013
Donald James Phillipps Past President 22/08/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Marian Hobbs Committee Member 1/02/2022
Sharon Elizabeth Dell Ex-officio Committee Member 1/12/2021
James John Beattie Member 29/10/2021
Peter Colin Hodgson Immediate Past President 2/02/2020
Gregor A Macaulay Committee member 10/12/2018
Peter George Holland Committee Member 30/06/2018
Beryl Joy Maultby Hon. Treasurer 1/01/2018
Beryl Maultby Honorary Treasurer 30/11/2016
Sara Barham Secretary 20/07/2016
Gerard Majella Ellis Honorary Treasurer 15/07/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/05/2021 NOC020
4/05/2021 NOC019
6/12/2019 NOC017
10/12/2018 NOC013
7/04/2017 NOC011
7/04/2017 NOC010
11/02/2015 NOC008
19/12/2013 NOC007
16/09/2012 AR006
20/07/2011 AR005

Charity Documents