pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Otago Art Society Incorporated
CC39908
9429042792550
Registered

Registration details

8/05/2009
May 31

Address for service

PO Box 5174
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9054
1st Floor, Dunedin Railway Station
20-22 Anzac Avenue
Anzac Square
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

03 477 9465
Facebook icon image
Otago Art Society OAS


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To fulfil the purpose of education in and advancement of art in Otago, and promote interest in the study of, and practice of the fine and applied arts.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Promotion / support of Art

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Artist Members

Entity Structure

We are a not-for-profit organisation mainly run by volunteers and overseen by our council as listed operating from premises consisting of 4 galleries and a shop where all our members can display and sell their work.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30/11/2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30/11/2010.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/11/2022 24/08/2022 $183,572 $156,324
30/11/2021 8/11/2021 $187,282 $184,238
30/11/2020 14/09/2020 $161,819 $184,897
30/11/2019 29/11/2019 $194,169 $188,622
30/11/2018 3/10/2018 $335,691 $162,863
30/11/2017 23/11/2017 $190,603 $159,811
30/11/2016 31/08/2016 $159,842 $140,854
30/11/2015 20/10/2015 $104,590 $123,166
30/11/2014 4/11/2014 $109,909 $120,106
30/11/2013 27/09/2013 $108,299 $123,035

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mary Jane Sneyd Councillor 10/02/2022
Hayley Rata Heyes Councillor 9/11/2021
Peter Robin Hurst Councillor 14/10/2021
Rosemary Dawn Hurst Councillor 14/10/2021
Anne Christine Baldock Councillor 20/08/2020
Danielle Lee Munro Councillor 16/08/2018
Lindsay Campbell Councillor 16/08/2018
Lorna Allan Councillor 16/08/2018
Brenda Nyhof President 17/08/2017
Marilene de Souza Gomes Councillor 31/08/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Hayden Trevor Robert Williams Councillor 18/08/2022
Annie Pepers Senior Vice President 2/12/2021
Eleanor Clark Girvan Councillor 2/12/2021
John Murray Stent Councillor 2/12/2021
Nicholas L D Dempster Immediate Past President 14/10/2021
Geoff Adams Councillor 31/07/2021
Julia McNaughton Councillor 1/04/2021
Anton Lambaart Junior Vice President 31/03/2021
Allison Frankie Simpson Councillor 31/10/2020
Celia Duff Councillor 31/07/2020

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/07/2022 NOC023
19/07/2022 NOC022
4/12/2021 NOC021
21/10/2021 NOC019
4/09/2020 NOC017
31/10/2019 NOC015
29/10/2019 NOC014
27/08/2018 NOC012
5/11/2015 NOC009
22/10/2014 NOC008

Charity Documents