Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wildlife.ai Trust
Wildlife.ai
CC57052
9429047167070
Registered

Registration details

16/10/2019
March 31

Address for service

49 Currie Street
New Plymouth
4310

Charity's other details

0220742269
https://www.linkedin.com/company/wildlife-ai

North America

United States

Asia

Israel


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The goal of Wildlife.ai is to promote the use of artificial intelligence for the protection of biodiversity. To achieve our goal we: 1) support individuals and organisations to use artificial intelligence for wildlife conservation and 2) educate the public about the applications and benefits of using artificial intelligence for the conservation and protection of species worldwide.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Environment / conservation

Animals

Entity Structure

Wildlife.ai is governed by a Board of Trustees comprising of a minimum of 2 and maximum of 10 trustees. Presently there are four Trustees who act in an advisory and management capacity, and one Trustee who act in an advisory capacity.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return for the year ending 30 November 2019 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 6/07/2023 $103,892 $39,727 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 18/08/2022 $51,189 $48,765 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 8/08/2021 $39,781 $31,474 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 29/05/2020 $221 $120 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
30/11/2019 30/04/2020 - - - - Exempt

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anna Megan Pendergrast Board member 25/09/2023
Christine Inga Laban Treasurer 26/04/2023
Callile Malcolm Bouzaid Board member 30/01/2023
Bar Vinograd Board member 9/11/2020
Joshua Mark Yellin Chairperson 16/10/2019
Amy Sara Brasch Secretary 30/11/2018
Victor Anton Valades Board member 30/11/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Aimee Megan Whitcroft Advisor 25/09/2023
Portia Jean Smith Treasurer 30/01/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/09/2023 NOC012
25/04/2023 NOC010
1/02/2023 NOC009
16/01/2023 NOC008
15/04/2021 NOC005
9/11/2020 NOC004
23/06/2020 NOC003
21/10/2019 NOC001

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.