pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand National Committee For Unicef Trust Board
UNICEF NZ
CC35979
9429043088201
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 10459
Pipitea
Wellington
6140
216A Willis Street
11 Aurora Terrace
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 815 9370
04 815 9389
Facebook icon image
UNICEF New Zealand
Twitter icon image
@unicefnz

Oceania

Kiribati, Papua New Guinea, Solomon Islands, Vanuatu

Africa

Ethiopia

South America

Venezuela

North America

Guatemala

Asia

Afghanistan, Bangladesh, East Timor, India, Syria, Vietnam, Yemen


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust maximises the generation of revenue for the work of UNICEF and also undertakes advocacy, communication, fundraising and public mobilisation activities in support of the goals and aims of UNICEF. The Trust also promotes the rights of children as outlined in the United Nations Convention on the Rights of the Child.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

International activities

Emergency / disaster relief, Fund-raising

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The New Zealand National Committee for UNICEF Trust Board is a charitable trust registered under the Charitable Trust Act 1957 and is registered as a Charity (no. CC35979) under the Charities Act 2005.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Unicef Childrens Foundation CC27773

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2022 25/05/2022 $14,670,735 $13,671,459
30/06/2021 2/06/2021 $14,492,014 $14,159,623
30/06/2020 22/05/2020 $13,929,318 $13,590,384
30/06/2019 26/04/2019 $12,279,526 $12,518,283
30/06/2018 29/05/2018 $12,485,191 $12,293,703
30/06/2017 16/05/2017 $11,553,194 $11,612,311
30/06/2016 19/05/2016 $13,774,910 $5,320,276
30/06/2015 28/05/2015 $10,263,716 $4,521,001
30/06/2014 16/06/2014 $10,141,122 $4,066,680
30/06/2013 26/06/2013 $8,982,986 $3,591,088

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Amanda Ellis Trustee 2/03/2022
Carmen Vicelich Trustee 9/12/2019
Rachel Petero Trustee 9/12/2019
Mavis Mullins Trustee 9/08/2019
Linda Jenkinson Trustee 31/08/2018
Simon Lyle Wi Rutene Trustee 24/11/2017
Anita Killeen Trustee 8/09/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Liz Gibbs Trustee 15/05/2022
Mark Oldershaw Trustee 22/05/2020
Annah Stretton Trustee 20/04/2020
Jenny Chu Trustee 16/10/2019
Mavis Mullins Trustee 12/06/2019
Chris Allen Trustee 10/05/2019
Arish Naresh Trustee 15/02/2019
Gopika Gnanakumar Trustee 15/02/2019
Jon Ramage Trustee 27/03/2018
Paula Snowden Trustee 8/09/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/06/2022 NOC039
9/06/2022 NOC038
1/03/2022 NOC036
13/08/2021 NOC035
23/03/2020 NOC032
12/08/2019 NOC031
13/06/2019 NOC030
13/06/2019 NOC029
22/02/2019 NOC027
7/12/2018 NOC026

Charity Documents