Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand National Committee For Unicef Trust Board
UNICEF NZ
CC35979
9429043088201
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 10459
Pipitea
Wellington
6140
Level 5
86 Victoria Street
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 815 9370
04 815 9389
UNICEF New Zealand
@unicefnz

Oceania

Kiribati, Papua New Guinea, Solomon Islands, Tonga, Vanuatu

Africa

Ethiopia, Somalia, South Sudan

Asia

Afghanistan, East Timor, Pakistan, Syria, Vietnam, Yemen


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust maximises the generation of revenue for the work of UNICEF and also undertakes advocacy, communication, fundraising and public mobilisation activities in support of the goals and aims of UNICEF. The Trust also promotes the rights of children as outlined in the United Nations Convention on the Rights of the Child.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

International activities

Emergency / disaster relief, Fund-raising

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The New Zealand National Committee for UNICEF Trust Board is a charitable trust registered under the Charitable Trust Act 1957 and is registered as a Charity (no. CC35979) under the Charities Act 2005.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Unicef Childrens Foundation CC27773

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 30/06/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2022 30/06/2023 29/06/2023 $19,453,785 $19,392,649 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2021 30/06/2022 25/05/2022 $14,670,735 $13,671,459 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2020 30/06/2021 2/06/2021 $14,492,014 $14,159,623 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2019 30/06/2020 22/05/2020 $13,929,318 $13,590,384 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2018 30/06/2019 26/04/2019 $12,279,526 $12,518,283 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2017 30/06/2018 29/05/2018 $12,485,191 $12,293,703 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2016 30/06/2017 16/05/2017 $11,553,194 $11,612,311 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2015 30/06/2016 19/05/2016 $13,774,910 $5,320,276 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/12/2014 30/06/2015 28/05/2015 $10,263,716 $4,521,001 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Michelle Sharp Secretary 30/05/2024
Susan Chisnall Treasurer 30/05/2024
Jon Ramage Trustee 1/04/2024
Nicholas Wells Trustee 1/04/2024
Amanda Ellis Trustee 2/03/2022
Carmen Vicelich Trustee 9/12/2019
Rachel Petero Trustee 9/12/2019
Mavis Mullins Trustee 9/08/2019
Simon Lyle Wi Rutene Trustee 24/11/2017
Anita Killeen Trustee 8/09/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Linda Jenkinson Trustee 24/01/2023
Liz Gibbs Trustee 15/05/2022
Mark Oldershaw Trustee 22/05/2020
Annah Stretton Trustee 20/04/2020
Jenny Chu Trustee 16/10/2019
Mavis Mullins Trustee 12/06/2019
Chris Allen Trustee 10/05/2019
Arish Naresh Trustee 15/02/2019
Gopika Gnanakumar Trustee 15/02/2019
Jon Ramage Trustee 27/03/2018
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/06/2024 NOC045
16/04/2024 NOC044
4/08/2023 NOC043
18/04/2023 NOC041
3/02/2023 NOC040
29/06/2022 NOC039
9/06/2022 NOC038
1/03/2022 NOC036
13/08/2021 NOC035
23/03/2020 NOC032
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.