pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Sustaining Hawke's Bay Trust
Environment Centre Hawke's Bay
CC25936
9429042945826
Registered

Registration details

15/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 11064
Hastings North
Hastings
4158
201 Southland Road
Hastings 4122
Mayfair
Hastings
4122

Charity's other details

06 870 4942
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/EnvironmentCentreHawkesBay/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Supporting people to create a sustainable Hawke's Bay community. Inspiring - By actively demonstrating a participative and cooperative approach, and providing positive solutions. • Leading - By engaging with communities, national, and local, and enabling new actions to be taken in adapting to sustainable personal behaviours and business practices. By leading through building strong networks to extend the understanding of the wider issues relating to creating a sustainable community by representation, creating affiliations, sharing information and supporting like-minded organisations. • Educating - By raising the level of community awareness, consumer practices and behaviours of sustainable and environmentally friendly activities. By running community courses, conducting presentations, seminars, and forums and identifying relevant information sources and gathering and distributing this to interested parties.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Marae on reservation land, Emergency / disaster relief, Sustainability

General public

Children / young people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

An incorporated charitable trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/11/2022 8/12/2022 $307,893 $323,787
30/09/2021 23/09/2021 $264,135 $230,179
30/09/2020 10/11/2020 $237,804 $208,355
30/09/2019 9/11/2020 $193,604 $147,577
30/09/2018 28/09/2018 $138,554 $118,017
30/09/2017 24/10/2017 $131,737 $123,545
30/09/2016 29/09/2016 $147,413 $148,663
30/09/2015 24/07/2015 $135,361 $122,988
30/09/2014 22/07/2014 $97,386 $106,020
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 15 months from 1 April 2022 to 30 June 2023.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anthony Owen Cole Trustee 12/12/2022
Joanne Meri Teresa Heperi Trustee 12/12/2022
Karen Morrish Trustee 12/12/2022
Rizwaana Latiff Trustee 12/12/2022
Andrew Phillips Trustee 28/08/2019
Rebecca Ashcroft-Allen Trustee 28/08/2019
Sarah Walker Trustee 25/07/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Callum Ross Trustee 12/12/2022
Marie Fleming Trustee 12/12/2022
Sarah Knight Trustee 4/02/2021
John Adams Chair 1/02/2021
Marion Thomson Trustee 1/02/2021
Richard James Thompson Trustee 3/09/2020
Neomal Attapattu Treasurer 25/07/2019
Sarah Grant Trustee 25/07/2019
Atarau Hamilton-Fuller Trustee 26/07/2018
Cynthia Growden Trustee 26/07/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/04/2023 NOC032
12/12/2022 NOC031
19/10/2022 NOC029
16/06/2022 NOC027
26/01/2021 NOC025
3/09/2020 NOC022
26/10/2017 NOC020
25/10/2017 NOC019
21/06/2017 NOC017
12/05/2017 NOC016

Charity Documents