Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Rugby For Life Charitable Trust
CC59318
N/A
Registered

Registration details

14/06/2021
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 584
Whangarei
0140
136 Riverside Drive
Kerikeri 0230
Parahaki
Whangarei
0112

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Rugby for Life is a community rugby partnership program that leverages the power of rugby to help improve the lives of all Northlanders and their communities. Building on networks, values and influence of NRU and their community, the Rugby for Life program will provide meaningful support to local communities at a local level in all corners of the region, to achieve positive health, education and employment outcomes in Northland. Focusing on the most significant social and economic issues.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Sport / recreation

Education / training / research, Health, Employment, Economic development

Children / young people

Voluntary bodies other than charities, General public

Entity Structure

We are run online throughout Northland, with an administration office based in Kerikeri. We are also accessible via the Northland Rugby Union office in Whangarei. Our trust deed states that we must have between 4 and 10 Trustees. We currently have eight Trustees that constitute our governance board, including two executive positions: Chairperson and Secretary. We are affiliated with Northland Rugby Union but it does not control or in any way direct our operations.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 24/10/2022 $1,100,251 $637,728 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Geoff Milner Trustee 26/06/2021
Ajit Balasingham Chairperson 2/10/2020
Martin Cleave Trustee 2/10/2020
Riki Kinnaird Trustee 2/10/2020
Sharon Morgan Trustee 2/10/2020
Thomas Waaka Trustee 2/10/2020

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Belinda Edwards Deputy Chair 19/06/2023
Murray Reade Trustee 19/06/2023

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/07/2023 NOC003
22/06/2023 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.