pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


LHF Limited
CC42118
9429000019385
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

Private Bag 19983
Avondale
Auckland
1746
395 Rosebank Road
Avondale
Auckland
1026

Charity's other details

09 829 5700
09 829 5703


Group Members


Below are all the members of Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Adventist Development and Relief Agency
Bethesda Care Limited
Bethesda Village Limited
LHF Limited
New Zealand Conference of the Seventh Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Health Association Limited
New Zealand Pacific Union Conference of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church
New Zealand Wholistic Health And Wellbeing Company Limted
North New Zealand Conference of the Seventh-day Adventist Church
Seventh-day Adventist Church Property Trustee (NZ) Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Production and distribution of healthy foods, promotion of a healthy lifestyle and the support of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Commercial activities to raise funds for religious purposes, including promoting & educating the general public about healthy living & healthy eating in accordance with religious beliefs

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Health, Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Part of the Seventh-Day Adventist Church in New Zealand

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2014 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2013 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2012 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2011 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2010 Member of 'Seventh Day Adventist Church in New Zealand 1' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rodney Brady Director 1/01/2016
Graeme Drinkall Director 1/01/2015
Kevin Allan Jackson Director 21/06/2005

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Julie Judd Director 31/12/2015
Schalk Pierre Van Heerden Director 31/12/2015
Ian Arthur Watts Director 30/12/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/01/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents