Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Chinmaya Mission - New Zealand
CC20072
9429043070343
Registered

Registration details

18/11/2007
March 31

Address for service

63 McKenzie Road
Mangere Bridge
Auckland
2022

Charity's other details

021 126 8729


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our Vision: The inner transformation of individuals through knowledge of Vendanta, spiritual practices and service to society ,resulting in a happy world around them. Our Mission: To provide to individuals from any background, the wisdom of Vedanta and the practical means for spiritual growth and happiness , enabling them to become positive contributors to society. As a spiritual institution, we aim for inner growth at individual and collective levels. The mission offers a wide array of Vedanta study forums for all ages.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(We provide Spiritual & Cultural education. We also offer Yoga & meditation, and promote art and music.Our activities are catered for all age groups and people from all backgrounds.)

Other (please state)

(Spiritual & Cultural education.)

Other (please state)

(Children, Youth and families)

Entity Structure

Board of Trustees Swami Swaroopananda:Chairman Swamini Amritananda (Susan Spedding/Brni.Bhakti Chaitanya) Kishan Raj-President Ramalingam Ulaganathan Prabha Hariswamy-Treasurer Amrat Ranchod Rahul Chopra Executive Committee: Swamini Amritananda-Resident Teacher & Head of New Zealand operations Anish Aya-Resident teacher Ramalingam Ulaganathan-Community wellbeing manager Melina Roy- Secretary Prabha Hariswamy-Treasurer Rahul Chopra-Marketing manager +some more

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 1/10/2023 $280,311 $622,146 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/11/2022 29/11/2022 $277,142 $256,149 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 23/09/2021 $546,357 $60,331 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 8/09/2020 $369,031 $201,410 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 29/09/2019 $234,470 $190,088 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 26/09/2018 $224,559 $146,518 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 31/10/2017 $250,009 $128,005 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 30/11/2016 $243,331 $161,689 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 18/09/2015 $246,118 $183,989 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rahul Chopra Trustee- Youth president and Marketing manager 12/08/2021
Prabha Hariswamy Trustee 18/04/2010
Susan Spedding Trustee 19/11/2007
Swaroopananda Swami Trustee 19/11/2007
Amrat Ranchhod Trustee 31/08/2007
Kishan Raj Trustee 31/08/2007
Ramalingam Ulaganathan Trustee 31/08/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Charul Anup Shah Trustee and secretary to the Board of Trustees 26/05/2023
Vinod Kumar Patel Trustee 12/08/2021
Vinayak Nigudkar Trustee 21/01/2021
Subhashini Karan Trustee 8/07/2020
Tejomayananda Swami Trustee 10/04/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/06/2012 NOC004
6/07/2010 NOC003
31/08/2009 AR002
31/08/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.