Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Theatreview Trust
Theatreview
CC45963
9429043294244
Registered

Registration details

4/01/2011
March 31

Address for service

22 Porritt Avenue
Mount Victoria
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 3829850
https://www.facebook.com/Theatreview/
https://mobile.twitter.com/theatreview


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To create and publish on-line reviews and archival records of performing arts practice.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides performing arts reviews, education, information, online discussion, community interaction/acts as a public resource), Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Community development

General public

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 20/06/2023 $39,466 $39,151 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 30/05/2022 $19,136 $20,940 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 11/11/2021 $35,480 $37,448 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 16/05/2020 $49,048 $46,735 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 26/08/2019 $26,372 $24,508 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 19/09/2018 $17,447 $17,329 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 24/11/2017 $26,538 $37,822 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 27/10/2016 $50,787 $49,989 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2015 30/09/2015 23/11/2015 $57,205 $47,545 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2014 30/09/2014 16/09/2014 $45,626 $42,879 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
loading image for pagination

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Brigitte Knight Trustee 4/12/2023
Iosefa Punefu Enari Trustee 4/12/2023
Mitchell Manuel Trustee 13/11/2023
Daniel Slevin Trustee 24/07/2023
Betty Edwanna Cosgrove Trustee 16/12/2019
Marjorie Sheana McKee Trustee and Treasurer 7/08/2017
Dawn Jane Sanders Chairperson 8/12/2010
John Bowen Smythe Trustee 1/12/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sally Ann Thorburn Trustee 4/12/2023
Lyne Vivian Pringle Trustee 30/01/2023
Brett Warren Adam Trustee 18/11/2021
Helen Philippa Forlong Trustee 18/11/2021
Colleen McColl Trustee 27/05/2021
Raewyn Joy Whyte Trustee 1/02/2021
Simon A"Court Taylor Treasurer 31/03/2018
Shannon Friday Secretary 31/03/2017
Michael Brian Wray Trustee 15/09/2015
Todrick Simon Taylor Trustee 1/09/2013
loading image for pagination

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/01/2024 NOC036
22/12/2023 NOC035
21/12/2023 NOC034
15/11/2023 NOC033
30/07/2023 NOC032
26/02/2023 NOC029
21/11/2021 NOC027
31/05/2021 NOC025
16/02/2021 NOC024
15/02/2021 NOC023
loading image for pagination

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.