Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Effective Altruism NZ Charitable Trust
CC53092
9429043315505
Registered

Registration details

18/02/2016
March 31

Address for service

2C Handley Avenue
Narrow Neck
Auckland
0624

Charity's other details

094451296

Africa

Kenya, Liberia, Malawi, Rwanda, Uganda


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust promotes effective altruism, focused on the relief of poverty.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Economic development

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Emergency / disaster relief, International activities, Fund-raising, Relief of poverty

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Migrants / refugees, Poor People

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 30/09/2024 $817,600 $955,123 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 24/08/2023 $1,034,027 $965,491 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 21/07/2022 $832,506 $953,646 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 20/07/2021 $849,672 $586,781 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 13/09/2020 $452,716 $350,349 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 14/08/2019 $328,349 $264,849 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 11/10/2018 $130,043 $51,222 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 8/05/2017 $116,028 $115,000 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 29/09/2016 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rowan Nola Catherine Clements Trustee 31/03/2020
Brian David Walters Trustee 9/05/2017
Catherine Isbell Low Trustee 3/02/2016
David Jeffrey Allis Trustee 3/02/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Evan Geoffrey Simmers Trustee 27/01/2024
Ivan Oleksandrovych Burduk Trustee 25/02/2022

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/11/2024 NOC016
16/02/2022 NOC012
31/03/2020 NOC009
9/01/2020 NOC008
19/08/2019 NOC007
9/05/2017 NOC004
7/04/2017 NOC002

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.