pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hector's World Limited
CC24059
9429034502921
Registered

Registration details

7/05/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 124
Shortland Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1140
59 High Street
130 Broadway
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

(09)3530620


Group Members


Below are all the members of The Internet Safety Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Hector's World Limited
Netsafe Incorporated

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Not trading

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

International activities

Children / young people

General public, Family / whanau, schools / early childhood centres

Entity Structure

Incorporated charitable company

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2022 Member of 'The Internet Safety Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2021 Member of 'The Internet Safety Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2020 Member of 'The Internet Safety Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2019 Member of 'The Internet Safety Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2018 Member of 'The Internet Safety Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2017 Member of 'The Internet Safety Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2016 Member of '' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2015 18/04/2016 $160 $1,657
30/09/2014 18/04/2016 $131 $745
30/09/2013 7/10/2013 $217 $2,280

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jonathan James Duffy Board Chair 16/02/2021

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Richard John Simon Shera Board Member 16/02/2021
Elizabeth Stanford Butterfield Board member 4/11/2010
Howard George Broad Board Member 11/08/2010
John McCarthy Board member 11/08/2010
Susan Pezaro Board Member 11/12/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/04/2017 NOC012
18/04/2016 NOC009
21/10/2014 NOC008
23/10/2012 AR005
16/12/2010 NOC004
16/12/2010 AR003
29/09/2010 NOC003
22/04/2010 NOC002
25/09/2009 AR002

Charity Documents