Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Otago University Rowing Club Health and Education Foundation
OURC Health and Education Foundation
CC53304
N/A
Registered

Registration details

17/03/2016
March 31

Address for service

C/- Otago University Rowing Club
PO Box 1436
Dunedin
9054
10 McGeorge Avenue
Mornington
Dunedin
9011

Charity's other details

03 477 1060
03 477 1060


Organisation with a focus on the following communities:

N/A

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The foundation will provide funds to support the Otago University Rowing Club activities which include student rowing, special olympians, masters rowing and education scholarships for student rowers.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Fund-raising

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Social services, Sport / recreation

Children / young people

Older people, People with disabilities

Legal Structure

Charitable Trusts incorporated under the Charitable Trusts Act

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

For Year Ended Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2025 30/09/2025 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2024 30/09/2024 11/06/2024 $15,399 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2023 30/09/2023 3/05/2023 $1,582 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2022 30/09/2022 2/05/2022 $3,680 $42,122 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2021 30/09/2021 9/05/2021 $10,938 $10,800 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2020 30/09/2020 19/04/2020 $17,671 $4,817 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2019 30/09/2019 27/05/2019 $48,581 $36,275 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2018 30/09/2018 1/06/2018 $10,230 $3,257 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2017 30/09/2017 23/05/2017 $17,574 $5,175 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif
31/03/2016 30/09/2016 23/06/2016 $0 $0 load annual return's financial documents spinner gif

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alister William Robinson Trustee 22/02/2016
Christopher O'Leary Trustee 22/02/2016
Sara Lorraine Richardson Trustee 22/02/2016
Sergio Salis Trustee 22/02/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Sharon Van Turnhout Trustee 1/03/2024

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/06/2024 NOC011

Charity Documents


load dashboard supporting documents spinner gif
Date Uploaded Document Type Reference Name

No supporting documents.