pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Save Foulden Maar Incorporated
CC58352
9429047592902
Registered

Registration details

2/08/2019
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 115
Dannevirke
4942
26 Gordon Street
Dannevirke 4930
Dannevirke
4930

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/SaveFouldenMaar/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

A primary purpose is the Preservation, protection and conservation of Otago's natural heritage in perpetuity with a focus on fossiliferous geological and paleontological ecosystems, features, landforms and landscapes in Otago (including priority sites Foulden Maar and Hindon Maar) for the benefit of the Community (including urban, rural and scientific), the University of Otago and those who are tangata whenua.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/11/2023 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2022 12/08/2022 $0 $0
30/09/2021 12/08/2022 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rose Clucas Board Member 29/07/2019
Andrea Boasshard Board Member 19/07/2019
Emeritus Professor Sir Alan Mark Board Member 19/07/2019
Kimberley Collins Chair/ Board Member 19/07/2019
Peter Hayden Deputy Chair/ Board Member 19/07/2019
Peter Wimsett Treasurer/Board Member 19/07/2019
Shane Loader Secretary/Board Member 19/07/2019
Tamsin Braisher Board Member 19/07/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/02/2021 NOC001

Charity Documents