pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Birthright New Zealand
CC53117
9429043293216
Registered

Registration details

22/02/2016
June 30

Address for service

15 Shakespeare Road
Bluff Hill
Napier
4110
15 Shakespeare Road
204 Thorndon Quay
Bluff Hill
Napier
4110

Charity's other details

0800 457 146
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/birthrightnz


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Birthright works to strengthen and enrich the lives of children and families. We specialise in working with families led by one person.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Social services

Education / training / research, Community development

Family / whanau

Children / young people

Entity Structure

Birthright New Zealand is a Trust with affiliate organisations throughout New Zealand. The governance of the Trust is carried out by up to nine Trustees, of whom at least 3 must be elected by the affiliate organisations. Four trustees may be appointed although the elected Trustees must always form the majority of trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2022 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/03/2021 7/09/2021 $330,073 $370,427
31/12/2019 21/11/2019 $271,272 $328,260
31/12/2018 18/10/2018 $179,528 $274,907
31/12/2017 3/12/2017 $222,280 $243,575
31/12/2016 22/12/2016 $0 $11,243

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lisa Hardie Trustee 31/10/2022
Cleo Shortland Trustee - Appointed 4/10/2021
Riki Manarangi Chairperson 10/10/2020
Mark Vincent Ford Trustee 13/04/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Melissa Clarke-Reynolds Trustee - Appointed 15/01/2023
Leanne Leslie Inder CEO 30/04/2022
Wajirani Adhihetty Trustee - Elected 30/11/2021
Susan Elizabeth Symons Trustee 7/10/2021
Tracey Robinson Trustee 20/09/2021
Iona Mary Pannett Chief Executive Officer 10/03/2021
Colin Tuson Trustee/Treasurer 14/12/2020
Adrian Stuart Gregory Trustee/chairperson 13/09/2020
Jane Elizabeth Lancaster Trustee 30/01/2020
Megan Annette Thomas Chief Executive 10/05/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/03/2023 NOC022
31/10/2022 NOC021
19/11/2021 NOC020
10/03/2021 NOC018
9/03/2021 NOC017
27/01/2021 NOC016
21/11/2019 NOC014
1/11/2018 NOC013
23/10/2018 NOC012
6/06/2018 NOC010

Charity Documents